EP0811493 - Liquid ejection head and apparatus, and manufacturing method for the liquid ejection head [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.07.2004 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.07.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 18.08.2004 [2004/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1997/50] | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Asakawa, Yoshie 8248-7 Ohaza-Hotaka, Hotakamachi Minamiazumi-gun, Nagano-ken / JP | 02 /
Yoshihira, Aya Canon Kabushiki Kaisha, 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | 03 /
Yamakawa, Kouji Canon Kabushiki Kaisha, 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | 04 /
Orikasa, Tsuyoshi Canon Kabushiki Kaisha, 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | 05 /
Ishinaga, Hiroyuki Canon Kabushiki Kaisha, 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | 06 /
Kashino, Toshio Canon Kabushiki Kaisha, 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | 07 /
Kigami, Hiroyuki Canon Kabushiki Kaisha, 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | 08 /
Hayasaki, Kimiyuki Canon Kabushiki Kaisha, 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | 09 /
Fukai, Hisashi Canon Kabushiki Kaisha, 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | 10 /
Kudo, Kiyomitsu Canon Kabushiki Kaisha, 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | 11 /
Ono, Takayuki Canon Kabushiki Kaisha, 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | 12 /
Ohkawa, Masayoshi Canon Kabushiki Kaisha, 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | [1997/50] | Representative(s) | Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis, et al Beresford Crump LLP 16 High Holborn London WC1V 6BX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/50] | Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis, et al BERESFORD & Co. 2-5 Warwick Court High Holborn London WC1R 5DJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 97303930.8 | 06.06.1997 | [1997/50] | Priority number, date | JP19960145684 | 07.06.1996 Original published format: JP 14568496 | JP19960145685 | 07.06.1996 Original published format: JP 14568596 | JP19960203144 | 12.07.1996 Original published format: JP 20314496 | [1997/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0811493 | Date: | 10.12.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/50] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0811493 | Date: | 07.06.2000 | [2000/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0811493 | Date: | 27.08.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.01.2000 | Classification | IPC: | B41J2/05, B41J2/14 | [1997/50] | CPC: |
B41J2/1404 (EP,US);
B41J2/14024 (EP,US);
B41J2/14048 (EP,US);
B41J2002/14379 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49401 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL [2001/07] |
Former [1997/50] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Kopf und Gerät zum Ausstossen von Flüssigkeit, und Verfahren zur Herstellung | [1997/50] | English: | Liquid ejection head and apparatus, and manufacturing method for the liquid ejection head | [1997/50] | French: | Tête et dispositif d'éjection de liquide, et procédé pour sa fabrication | [1997/50] | Examination procedure | 13.11.2000 | Examination requested [2001/02] | 08.12.2000 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 23.01.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.03.2001 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, DK, FI, GR, IE, LI, LU, MC, PT, SE | 07.08.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.05.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 23.12.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 03.01.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination {1} | 06.02.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.04.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 11.04.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.05.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/34] | Request for further processing for: | 23.12.2002 | Request for further processing filed | 23.12.2002 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 16.01.2003 | Decision despatched | 07.08.2001 | Request for further processing filed | 07.08.2001 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 28.08.2001 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 18.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 04.01.2001 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 04.01.2001 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 04.01.2001 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 04.01.2001 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 04.01.2001 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 04.01.2001 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 04.01.2001 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 04.01.2001 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 04.01.2001 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 04.01.2001 | SE   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5278585 (KARZ ROBERT S [US], et al) [A] 1,7,11,15,37 * column 3 - column 6; figures 3,5 *; | [A]JPH05124189 ; | [X]JPH03292146 ; | [DX]JPS63199972 ; | [E]EP0737582 (CANON KK [JP]) [E] 76,77 * page 11 - page 12; figures 4,5 *; | [E]EP0721842 (CANON KK [JP]) [E] 76 * page 17, line 4 - line 5; figures 23,24 * * page 17, line 22 - line 23 *; | [A]JPH03234538 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19930907), vol. 017, no. 493, Database accession no. (M - 1475), & JP05124189 A 19930521 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [A] 1,7,11,15,37 * abstract * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19920402), vol. 016, no. 129, Database accession no. (M - 1228), & JP03292146 A 19911224 (SHARP CORP) [X] 67,77 * abstract * | [DX] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19881214), vol. 012, no. 478, Database accession no. (M - 775), & JP63199972 A 19880818 (CANON INC) [DX] 76 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19920116), vol. 016, no. 016, Database accession no. (M - 1200), & JP03234538 A 19911018 (SHARP CORP) [A] 67,76,77 * abstract * |