EP0812837 - Recovery of isoflavones from soy molasses [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.06.2006 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.06.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.08.2006 [2006/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Archer Daniels Midland Company 4666 Faries Parkway Decatur, IL 62526 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2005/36] | For all designated states Archer Daniels Midland Company 466 Fairies Parkway Decatur, IL 62526 / US | ||
Former [2004/41] | For all designated states SOLAE, LLC 1034 Danforth Drive St. Louis, MO 63102 / US | ||
Former [1997/51] | For all designated states PROTEIN TECHNOLOGIES INTERNATIONAL, INC. Checkerboard Square Saint Louis, Missouri 63164 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Waggle, Doyle H. 348 Rieth Terrace Kirkwood, Missouri 63122 / US | 02 /
Bryan, Barbara A. 7039 Pershing Avenue University City, Missouri 63130 / US | [1997/51] | Representative(s) | Tubby, David George Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/51] | Tubby, David George MARKS & CLERK, 57-60 Lincoln's Inn Fields London WC2A 3LS / GB | Application number, filing date | 97304076.9 | 11.06.1997 | [1997/51] | Priority number, date | US19960661845 | 11.06.1996 Original published format: US 661845 | [1997/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0812837 | Date: | 17.12.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0812837 | Date: | 24.08.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/34] | Type: | B8 Corrected title page of specification | No.: | EP0812837 | Date: | 26.10.2005 | [2005/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.10.1997 | Classification | IPC: | C07D311/40, C07D311/36, C07H17/07 | [1997/51] | CPC: |
C07D311/40 (EP,US);
C07D311/36 (EP,KR,US);
C07H17/07 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1997/51] | Title | German: | Gewinnung von Isoflavonen aus Sojamelasse | [1997/51] | English: | Recovery of isoflavones from soy molasses | [1997/51] | French: | Récupération de d'isoflavones à partir de mélasse de soja | [1997/51] | Examination procedure | 01.07.1997 | Examination requested [1997/51] | 13.05.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.01.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 17.03.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.03.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.09.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.10.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.04.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 29.04.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP05018136.1 / EP1659118 | EP05018137.9 / EP1659119 | Opposition(s) | 26.05.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/31] | Request for further processing for: | 17.03.2004 | Request for further processing filed | 17.03.2004 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 30.03.2004 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 21.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 24.08.2005 | BE | 24.08.2005 | CH | 24.08.2005 | FI | 24.08.2005 | LI | 24.08.2005 | NL | 24.08.2005 | DK | 24.11.2005 | GR | 24.11.2005 | SE | 24.11.2005 | PT | 24.01.2006 | [2006/26] |
Former [2006/25] | AT | 24.08.2005 | |
BE | 24.08.2005 | ||
CH | 24.08.2005 | ||
FI | 24.08.2005 | ||
LI | 24.08.2005 | ||
NL | 24.08.2005 | ||
GR | 24.11.2005 | ||
SE | 24.11.2005 | ||
PT | 24.01.2006 | ||
Former [2006/14] | AT | 24.08.2005 | |
CH | 24.08.2005 | ||
FI | 24.08.2005 | ||
LI | 24.08.2005 | ||
NL | 24.08.2005 | ||
GR | 24.11.2005 | ||
SE | 24.11.2005 | ||
Former [2006/13] | AT | 24.08.2005 | |
FI | 24.08.2005 | ||
SE | 24.11.2005 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JPH01258669 ; | [Y]JPH04283518 ; | [PY]JPH08283283 ; | [E]WO9726269 (ACDS TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]) [E] 1-59* the whole document *; | [XY] - BARNES S ET AL, "ISOFLAVONES AND THEIR CONJUGATES IN SOY FOODS: EXTRACTION CONDITIONS AND ANALYSIS BY HPLC-MASS SPECTROMETRY", JOURNAL OF AGRICULTURAL AND FOOD CHEMISTRY, (199411), vol. 42, no. 11, pages 2466 - 2474, XP000474641 [XY] 1-59 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jf00047a019 | [XY] - COWARD L ET AL, "GENISTEIN, DAIDZEIN, AND THEIR BETA-GLYCOSIDE CONJUGATES: ANTITUMOR ISOFLAVONES IN SOYBEAN FOODS FROM AMERICAN AND ASIAN DIETS", JOURNAL OF AGRICULTURAL AND FOOD CHEMISTRY, (199311), vol. 41, no. 11, pages 1961 - 1967, XP002028058 [XY] 1-59 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jf00035a027 | [Y] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 89, no. 47, Database accession no. 89-345164, XP002041931 & JPH01258669 A 19891016 (KIKKOMAN CORP) [Y] 1-59 * abstract * | [Y] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 92, no. 47, Database accession no. 92-385398, XP002041932 & JPH04283518 A 19921008 (KIKKOMAN CORP) [Y] 1-59 * abstract * | [PY] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 97, no. 02, Database accession no. 97-017368, XP002041933 & JPH08283283 A 19961029 (KIKKOMAN CORP) [PY] 1-59 * abstract * |