EP0816330 - Process for the preparation of N-acetonylbenzamides [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1998/02] | N-acetonylbenzamide fungicides | ||
[2000/14] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.11.2001 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.11.2009 | Change - representative | published on 16.12.2009 [2009/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROHM AND HAAS COMPANY 100 Independence Mall West Philadelphia, PA 19106-2399 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1998/02] | For all designated states ROHM AND HAAS COMPANY 100 Independence Mall West Philadelphia, Pennsylvania 19106-2399 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Michelotti, Enrique Luis 1316 Highland Avenue Fort Washington, Pennsylvania 19034 / US | 02 /
Young, David Hamilton 917 David Road Ambler Pennsylvania 19002 / US | 03 /
McLaughlin, Thomas Anthony Wyoming Avenue Penndel, Pennsylvania 19047 / US | [1998/02] | Representative(s) | Buckley, Guy Julian, et al Patent Outsourcing Limited 1 King Street Bakewell Derbyshire DE45 1DZ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/51] | Buckley, Guy Julian, et al Patent Outsourcing Limited 1 King Street Bakewell Derbyshire DE45 1DZ / GB | ||
Former [1999/37] | Buckley, Guy Julian, et al ROHM AND HAAS (UK) LTD. European Operations Patent Department Lennig House 2 Mason's Avenue Croydon CR9 3NB / GB | ||
Former [1998/02] | Tanner, James Percival, et al ROHM AND HAAS (UK) LTD. European Operations Patent Department Lennig House 2 Mason's Avenue Croydon CR9 3NB / GB | Application number, filing date | 97304190.8 | 16.06.1997 | [1998/02] | Priority number, date | US19960020516 | 28.06.1996 Original published format: US 20516 | [1998/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0816330 | Date: | 07.01.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0816330 | Date: | 27.12.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.10.1997 | Classification | IPC: | C07C233/76, C07D213/82, A01N43/40 | [1998/02] | CPC data not yet available | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [1998/38] |
Former [1998/02] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Extension states | LV | 26.08.1997 | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von N-Acetonylbenzamide | [2000/14] | English: | Process for the preparation of N-acetonylbenzamides | [2000/14] | French: | Procédé de préparation de N-acétonylbenzamides | [2000/14] |
Former [1998/02] | Fungizide N-Acetonylbenzamide | ||
Former [1998/02] | N-acetonylbenzamide fungicides | ||
Former [1998/02] | N-acétonylbenzamides fongicides | Examination procedure | 07.07.1997 | Examination requested [1998/02] | 17.12.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.08.1999 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 25.10.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.04.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 23.06.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.07.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 03.07.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.09.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/51] | Request for further processing for: | 25.10.1999 | Request for further processing filed | 02.11.1999 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 15.11.1999 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 27.12.2000 | BE | 27.12.2000 | ES | 27.12.2000 | NL | 27.12.2000 | SE | 27.12.2000 | DK | 27.03.2001 | PT | 27.03.2001 | GR | 30.03.2001 | LU | 16.06.2001 | IE | 18.06.2001 | [2004/51] |
Former [2004/39] | AT | 27.12.2000 | |
BE | 27.12.2000 | ||
ES | 27.12.2000 | ||
NL | 27.12.2000 | ||
SE | 27.12.2000 | ||
DK | 27.03.2001 | ||
PT | 27.03.2001 | ||
LU | 16.06.2001 | ||
IE | 18.06.2001 | ||
Former [2003/46] | AT | 27.12.2000 | |
BE | 27.12.2000 | ||
ES | 27.12.2000 | ||
NL | 27.12.2000 | ||
SE | 27.12.2000 | ||
DK | 27.03.2001 | ||
PT | 27.03.2001 | ||
IE | 18.06.2001 | ||
Former [2003/09] | AT | 27.12.2000 | |
BE | 27.12.2000 | ||
ES | 27.12.2000 | ||
NL | 27.12.2000 | ||
SE | 27.12.2000 | ||
PT | 27.03.2001 | ||
IE | 18.06.2001 | ||
Former [2002/48] | AT | 27.12.2000 | |
BE | 27.12.2000 | ||
ES | 27.12.2000 | ||
SE | 27.12.2000 | ||
PT | 27.03.2001 | ||
IE | 18.06.2001 | ||
Former [2002/27] | AT | 27.12.2000 | |
BE | 27.12.2000 | ||
ES | 27.12.2000 | ||
SE | 27.12.2000 | ||
PT | 27.03.2001 | ||
Former [2002/23] | AT | 27.12.2000 | |
BE | 27.12.2000 | ||
SE | 27.12.2000 | ||
PT | 27.03.2001 | ||
Former [2002/11] | AT | 27.12.2000 | |
BE | 27.12.2000 | ||
PT | 27.03.2001 | ||
Former [2002/02] | AT | 27.12.2000 | |
BE | 27.12.2000 | ||
Former [2001/37] | AT | 27.12.2000 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0170498 (ROHM & HAAS [US]) [A] 1,8,10* abstract *; | [A]EP0173453 (ROHM & HAAS [US]) [A] 1,8,10 * abstract *; | [D]US5254584 (MICHELOTTI ENRIQUE L [US], et al); | [D]US5304572 (MICHELOTTI ENRIQUE L [US], et al); | [A]EP0600629 (ROHM & HAAS [US]) [A] 1,8,10 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0604019 (ROHM & HAAS [US]) [A] 1,8,10 * the whole document *; | [X] - E.M. GORDON ET AL., TETRAHEDRON LETTERS, OXFORD GB, (1984), vol. 25, no. 31, pages 3277 - 3280, XP002041169 [X] 1 * page 3278; example 3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0040-4039(01)81363-0 |