EP0814115 - Method for producing a coated polycarbonate article [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.11.2004 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.11.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.01.2005 [2005/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1997/52] | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Riding, Karen Dorothy 21 Bellwood Way Castleton, New York 12033 / US | 02 /
Lilly, Kenneth Lee 335 Key West Drive Evansville, Indiana 47712 / US | 03 /
Stewart, Charles Francis 152 Churchill Street Pittsfield, Massachusetts 01201 / US | 04 /
Bassi, Bernard 8 Lincoln Street Adams, Massachusetts 01220 / US | [1997/52] | Representative(s) | Szary, Anne Catherine, et al GPO Europe GE International Inc. The Ark 201 Talgarth Road Hammersmith London W6 8BJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/52] | Szary, Anne Catherine, Dr., et al London Patent Operation, GE International, Inc., Essex House, 12-13 Essex Street London WC2R 3AA / GB | Application number, filing date | 97304229.4 | 17.06.1997 | [1997/52] | Priority number, date | US19960665711 | 18.06.1996 Original published format: US 665711 | [1997/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0814115 | Date: | 29.12.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/52] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0814115 | Date: | 20.05.1998 | [1998/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.04.1998 | Classification | IPC: | C08J7/04, C08J7/18, C09D4/02, // C08L69:00 | [1997/52] | CPC: |
B29C39/148 (EP,US);
B29C45/14778 (EP);
C08J7/0427 (EP);
C08J7/043 (EP,US);
C08J7/046 (EP,US);
C08J7/18 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL [1999/05] |
Former [1997/52] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung eines beschichteten Polycarbonatgegenstandes | [1997/52] | English: | Method for producing a coated polycarbonate article | [1997/52] | French: | Procédé pour fabriquer un article revêtu en polycarbonate | [1997/52] | Examination procedure | 20.11.1998 | Examination requested [1999/03] | 17.03.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.01.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.02.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.07.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/02] | 11.08.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2005/02] | Request for further processing for: | 14.01.2004 | Request for further processing filed | 14.01.2004 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 06.02.2004 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 01.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2004 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]EP0551693 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [X] 1-6 * complete document, especially page 5, lines 7,8 * [Y] 7; | [XY]JPS5924642 ; | [A]EP0311079 (MITSUBISHI GAS CHEMICAL CO [JP]) [A] 7 * example 1 * | [XY] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19840606), vol. 008, no. 120, Database accession no. (M - 300), & JP59024642 A 19840208 (AKINOBU TATEBAYASHI) [X] 7 * abstract * [Y] 7 |