Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
11.01.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 13.02.2008 [2008/07] |
05.03.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.04.2004 [2004/17] |
21.11.2003 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 07.01.2004 [2004/02] |
24.10.2003 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 10.12.2003 [2003/50] |
28.06.2003 | Change - inventor | published on 13.08.2003 [2003/33] |
14.03.2003 | (Expected) grant | published on 02.05.2003 [2003/18] |
07.03.2003 | Change - applicant | published on 23.04.2003 [2003/17] |
10.01.2003 | Communication of intention to grant a patent | |
10.07.2002 | Renewal fee | |
03.07.2002 | Communication of intention to grant a patent | |
13.06.2001 | Renewal fee | |
08.06.2001 | Examination report or reply | |
28.03.2001 | Examination report or reply | |
01.12.2000 | First examination report | |
24.11.2000 | Examination report or reply | |
14.06.2000 | Renewal fee | |
05.05.1999 | Renewal fee | |
31.07.1998 | Definitive list of designations | published on 16.09.1998 [1998/38] |
05.06.1998 | Request for examination filed | published on 22.07.1998 [1998/30] |
21.11.1997 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 07.01.1998 [1998/02] |