EP0842855 - Drop bag fitting [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.10.2000 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.10.2000 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.11.2000 [2000/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE POST OFFICE Impact House, 2 Edridge Road Croydon CR9 1PJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1998/21] | For all designated states the POST OFFICE Impact House, 2 Edridge Road Croydon CR9 1PJ / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Murray, Steve, c/o RoMec Manufacturing Services 30c Brunswick Road Edingburgh EH7 5NY / GB | [1998/21] | Representative(s) | Lee, Nicholas John, et al Haseltine Lake LLP Lincoln House, 5th Floor 300 High Holborn London WC1V 7JH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1998/21] | Lee, Nicholas John, et al Haseltine Lake & Co., Imperial House, 15-19 Kingsway London WC2B 6UD / GB | Application number, filing date | 97304560.2 | 26.06.1997 | [1998/21] | Priority number, date | GB19960024034 | 19.11.1996 Original published format: GB 9624034 | [1998/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0842855 | Date: | 20.05.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/21] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0842855 | Date: | 23.09.1998 | [1998/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.08.1998 | Classification | IPC: | B65B67/12 | [1998/21] | CPC: |
B65B67/12 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, LU, NL [1999/27] |
Former [1999/22] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, LI | ||
Former [1998/21] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Rahmen für Aufhängebeutel | [1998/21] | English: | Drop bag fitting | [1998/21] | French: | Cadre pour sac suspendu | [1998/21] | Examination procedure | 17.03.1999 | Examination requested [1999/19] | 24.03.1999 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 30.07.1999 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, CH, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, IT, LI, MC, PT, SE | 03.12.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.06.2000 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2000/48] | 07.07.2000 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2000/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 19.05.1999 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 19.05.1999 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 19.05.1999 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 19.05.1999 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 19.05.1999 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 19.05.1999 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 19.05.1999 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 19.05.1999 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 19.05.1999 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 19.05.1999 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 19.05.1999 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2000 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]FR913112 (MORTREUIL) [X] 1 * the whole document * [Y] 2,3,8; | [Y]DE156942 (KOCH) [Y] 2,3 * the whole document *; | [Y]CH557462 (THELIN) [Y] 2,3 * the whole document *; | [Y]FR2343669 (LAUNAY) [Y] 8 * the whole document * |