EP0817192 - 8/9 coding apparatus and method of same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.12.2004 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.02.2006 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR | published on 05.04.2006 [2006/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Corporation 6-7-35 Kitashinagawa Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1998/02] | For all designated states SONY CORPORATION 6-7-35 Kitashinagawa Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ando, Hideki, c/o Intel. Prop. Div., Sony Corp. 6-7-35 Kitashinagawa Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo 141 / JP | [1998/02] | Representative(s) | Williams, Janice, et al D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1998/02] | Williams, Janice, et al D. Young & Co., 21 New Fetter Lane London EC4A 1DA / GB | Application number, filing date | 97304813.5 | 02.07.1997 | [1998/02] | Priority number, date | JP19960172533 | 02.07.1996 Original published format: JP 17253396 | [1998/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0817192 | Date: | 07.01.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/02] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0817192 | Date: | 09.12.1998 | [1998/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0817192 | Date: | 04.02.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.10.1998 | Classification | IPC: | G11B20/14 | [1998/02] | CPC: |
G11B20/1426 (EP,US);
G11B2020/1434 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1999/33] |
Former [1998/02] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | 8/9 Kodierungsvorrichtung und Verfahren zu deren Betrieb | [1998/02] | English: | 8/9 coding apparatus and method of same | [1998/02] | French: | Procédé de codage 8/9 et méthode associée | [1998/02] | Examination procedure | 21.05.1999 | Examination requested [1999/29] | 09.07.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.11.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.08.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.11.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 13.11.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.11.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.07.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 04.02.2004 | DE | 05.05.2004 | GB | 02.07.2004 | [2006/14] |
Former [2005/46] | DE | 05.05.2004 | |
GB | 02.07.2004 | ||
Former [2005/12] | DE | 05.05.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH04252617 ; | [A]JPH06284015 ; | [A]US4775985 (BUSBY BRUCE E [US]) [A] 1,4,5,7-9,12,13,15,16 * figure 1 * * column 3, line 3 - line 10 * * column 3, line 55 - line 59 *; | [A]EP0310041 (NIPPON DENKI HOME ELECTRONICS [JP]) [A] 1,8,9,16 * column A * * column 5, line 5 - line 18 * * column 8, line 12 - line 16 * * column 10, line 6 - line 19 * * column 10, line 49 - column 11, line 6 * * figure 4 *; | [A]US4833471 (TOKUUME YOSHIHIRO [JP], et al); | [A]EP0415853 (SONY CORP [JP]) [A] 1,8,9,16 * column 3, line 52 - column 4, line 18 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19930121), vol. 017, no. 032, Database accession no. (E - 1309), & JP04252617 A 19920908 (TOSHIBA CORP) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19950228), vol. 095, no. 001, & JP06284015 A 19941007 (TOSHIBA CORP) |