EP0818704 - Plasma addressed liquid crystal display panel with internal anti-reflection coating [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.02.2001 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.02.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.03.2001 [2001/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TEKTRONIX, INC. 26600 S W Parkway Avenue P.O. Box 1000 Wilsonville, Oregon 97070-1000 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1998/03] | For all designated states TEKTRONIX, INC. 26600 S W Parkway Avenue, P.O. Box 1000 Wilsonville, Oregon 97070-1000 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ilcisin, Kevin J. 16728 SW Hargis Road Beaverton, Oregon 97007 / US | 02 /
Buzak, Thomas S. 9755 SW Stonecreek Drive Beaverton, Oregon 97007 / US | 03 /
Martin, Paul C. 11803 NW 24th Avenue Vancouver, Washington 98685 / US | [1998/03] | Representative(s) | Burke, Steven David, et al R.G.C. Jenkins & Co 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1998/03] | Burke, Steven David, et al R.G.C. Jenkins & Co. 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 97305008.1 | 08.07.1997 | [1998/03] | Priority number, date | US19960021675P | 12.07.1996 Original published format: US 21675 P | [1998/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0818704 | Date: | 14.01.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/03] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0818704 | Date: | 21.01.1998 | [1998/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.12.1997 | Classification | IPC: | G02F1/133, G02F1/1335 | [1998/03] | CPC: |
G02F1/13334 (EP,KR);
G02F1/133502 (EP,KR);
G09G3/3662 (KR);
H01J17/485 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [1998/40] |
Former [1998/03] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Plasmaadressierte Flüssigkristallanzeigetafel mit interner, antireflektierender Beschichtung | [1998/03] | English: | Plasma addressed liquid crystal display panel with internal anti-reflection coating | [1998/03] | French: | Panneau d'affichage à cristal liquide adressé par plasma à revêtement interne anti-réfléchissant | [1998/03] | Examination procedure | 06.03.1998 | Examination requested [1998/19] | 24.05.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.10.2000 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2001/12] | 02.11.2000 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2001/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]JPH0772464 ; | [Y]EP0596733 (SHARP KK [JP]) [Y] 2,3,5-8 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0689083 (SONY CORP [JP]) [A] 1-8 * column 7, line 23 - column 8, line 9 * * column 12, line 11 - line 26; figures 6,7,11 *; | [A]EP0696753 (SONY CORP [JP]) [A] 1,3,4,6 * column 4, line 53 - column 8, line 7; figures 1-3 *; | [A]JPS57616 | [XY] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19950731), vol. 095, no. 006, & JP07072464 A 19950317 (SONY CORP) [X] 1,4 * abstract * [Y] 2,3,5-8 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19820416), vol. 006, no. 059, Database accession no. (P - 110), & JP57000616 A 19820105 (SEIKO EPSON CORP) [A] 1,3-5 * abstract * |