Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO9936955 | Global Dossier | 22.07.1999 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US879698 | 20.01.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO03056060 | Global Dossier | 10.07.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US2637801 | 21.12.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2004099215 | Global Dossier | 27.05.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US56746195 | 05.12.1995 | US67721896 | 09.07.1996 | US67718596 | 09.07.1996 | US80824697 | 28.02.1997 | US49899095 | 06.07.1995 | US68091396 | 12.07.1996 | US71609603 | 18.11.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR100629540B | Global Dossier | 27.09.2006 | B1 | KR20000057985 | 25.09.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | US24818399 | 09.02.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR100582218B | Global Dossier | 23.05.2006 | B1 | KR20010034262 | 25.04.2001 | A | Priority number | Date | US879698 | 20.01.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPH10313054 | Global Dossier | 24.11.1998 | A | Priority number | Date | US82536097 | 28.03.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPH09312297 | Global Dossier | 02.12.1997 | A | Priority number | Date | US56746195 | 05.12.1995 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPH09115917 | Global Dossier | 02.05.1997 | A | Priority number | Date | US49899095 | 06.07.1995 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPH08246152 | Global Dossier | 24.09.1996 | A | Priority number | Date | US33952194 | 14.11.1994 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2011139093 | Global Dossier | 14.07.2011 | A | Priority number | Date | US879698 | 20.01.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2002510145 | Global Dossier | 02.04.2002 | A | Priority number | Date | US879698 | 20.01.1998 | US9825276 | 25.11.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2000286215 | Global Dossier | 13.10.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | US24818399 | 09.02.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0867941 | Global Dossier | 05.04.2000 | A3 | EP0867941 | 30.09.1998 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US82536097 | 28.03.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0776991 | Global Dossier | 06.02.2002 | B1 | EP0776991 | 04.06.1997 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US56746195 | 05.12.1995 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0711846 | Global Dossier | 15.05.1996 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US33952194 | 14.11.1994 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69619075T | 02.10.2002 | T2 | DE69619075D1 | 21.03.2002 | D1 | Priority number | Date | US56746195 | 05.12.1995 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR100542799B | 23.03.2006 | B1 | KR980011766 | 30.04.1998 | A | Priority number | Date | US67718596 | 09.07.1996 | US68091396 | 12.07.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR19980080770 | 25.11.1998 | A | Priority number | Date | US82536097 | 28.03.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR960019584 | 17.06.1996 | A | Priority number | Date | US33952194 | 14.11.1994 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR970052089 | 29.07.1997 | A | Priority number | Date | US56746195 | 05.12.1995 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR980011954 | 30.04.1998 | A | Priority number | Date | US67721896 | 09.07.1996 | US80824696 | 28.07.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | SG87084 | 19.03.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US24818399 | 09.02.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | TW393684B | 11.06.2000 | B | Priority number | Date | US81022197 | 28.02.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | TW434824B | 16.05.2001 | B | Priority number | Date | US82536097 | 28.03.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | TW442853B | 23.06.2001 | B | Priority number | Date | US879698 | 20.01.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6444036 | 03.09.2002 | B2 | US2001025205 | 27.09.2001 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US56746195 | 05.12.1995 | US81022197 | 28.02.1997 | US67721896 | 09.07.1996 | US73768100 | 15.12.2000 | US67718596 | 09.07.1996 | US33952194 | 14.11.1994 | US49899095 | 06.07.1995 | US68091396 | 12.07.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6365495 | 02.04.2002 | B2 | US2002001928 | 03.01.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US24818399 | 09.02.1999 | US879698 | 20.01.1998 | US56746195 | 05.12.1995 | US81022197 | 28.02.1997 | US33952194 | 14.11.1994 | US49899095 | 06.07.1995 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6699530 | 02.03.2004 | B2 | US2002001976 | 03.01.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US56746195 | 05.12.1995 | US67721896 | 09.07.1996 | US67718596 | 09.07.1996 | US80824697 | 28.02.1997 | US49899095 | 06.07.1995 | US68091396 | 12.07.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2002033533 | 21.03.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US81022197 | 28.02.1997 | US33952194 | 14.11.1994 | US49899095 | 06.07.1995 | US82536097 | 28.03.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2002114886 | 22.08.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US56746195 | 05.12.1995 | US67721896 | 09.07.1996 | US67718596 | 09.07.1996 | US80824697 | 28.02.1997 | US49899095 | 06.07.1995 | US2637801 | 21.12.2001 | US68091396 | 12.07.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6933021 | 23.08.2005 | B2 | US2002168468 | 14.11.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US56746195 | 05.12.1995 | US67721896 | 09.07.1996 | US67718596 | 09.07.1996 | US80824697 | 28.02.1997 | US49899095 | 06.07.1995 | US2637801 | 21.12.2001 | US68091396 | 12.07.1996 | US12457502 | 16.04.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5989999 | 23.11.1999 | A | Priority number | Date | US56746195 | 05.12.1995 | US81022197 | 28.02.1997 | US67721896 | 09.07.1996 | US67718596 | 09.07.1996 | US33952194 | 14.11.1994 | US80824697 | 28.02.1997 | US49899095 | 06.07.1995 | US93991497 | 26.09.1997 | US68091396 | 12.07.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6155198 | 05.12.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | US56746195 | 05.12.1995 | US67718596 | 09.07.1996 | US33952194 | 14.11.1994 | US49899095 | 06.07.1995 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6251758 | 26.06.2001 | B1 | Priority number | Date | US56746195 | 05.12.1995 | US81022197 | 28.02.1997 | US67721896 | 09.07.1996 | US67718596 | 09.07.1996 | US33952194 | 14.11.1994 | US49899095 | 06.07.1995 | US68091396 | 12.07.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6291343 | 18.09.2001 | B1 | Priority number | Date | US879698 | 20.01.1998 | US56746195 | 05.12.1995 | US81022197 | 28.02.1997 | US33952194 | 14.11.1994 | US49899095 | 06.07.1995 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6500742 | 31.12.2002 | B1 | Priority number | Date | US56746195 | 05.12.1995 | US81022197 | 28.02.1997 | US67721896 | 09.07.1996 | US67718596 | 09.07.1996 | US33952194 | 14.11.1994 | US49899095 | 06.07.1995 | US68091396 | 12.07.1996 | US61751500 | 14.07.2000 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPH10144626 | Global Dossier | 29.05.1998 | A | Priority number | Date | US81022197 | 28.02.1997 | US67721896 | 09.07.1996 | US67718596 | 09.07.1996 | US68091396 | 12.07.1996 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPH10125626 | Global Dossier | 15.05.1998 | A | Priority number | Date | US67721896 | 09.07.1996 | US67718596 | 09.07.1996 | US80824697 | 28.02.1997 | US68091396 | 12.07.1996 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4454675B | Global Dossier | 21.04.2010 | B2 | JP2009071293 | 02.04.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | US67721896 | 09.07.1996 | US67718596 | 09.07.1996 | US80824697 | 28.02.1997 | US68091396 | 12.07.1996 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0818559 | Global Dossier | 12.07.2000 | A3 | EP0818559 | 14.01.1998 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US67721896 | 09.07.1996 | US67718596 | 09.07.1996 | US80824697 | 28.02.1997 | US68091396 | 12.07.1996 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0818560 | Global Dossier | 03.01.2001 | A3 | EP0818560 | 14.01.1998 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US81022197 | 28.02.1997 | US67721896 | 09.07.1996 | US67718596 | 09.07.1996 | US68091396 | 12.07.1996 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | TW360907B | 11.06.1999 | B | Priority number | Date | US67721896 | 09.07.1996 | US67718596 | 09.07.1996 | US80824697 | 28.02.1997 | US68091396 | 12.07.1996 |