EP0818560 - Construction of a film on a semiconductor wafer [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 05.06.2009 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.06.2009 | Refusal of application | published on 08.07.2009 [2009/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Applied Materials, Inc. 3050 Bowers Avenue M/S 2061 Santa Clara, California 95054-3299 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1998/03] | For all designated states APPLIED MATERIALS, INC. 3050 Bowers Avenue, M/S 2061 Santa Clara, California 95054-3299 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Chern, Chyl 20110 Knollwood Drive Saratoga California 95070 / US | 02 /
Danek, Michal 1538 Blackhawk Drive Sunnyvale California 94087 / US | 03 /
Liao, Marvin 85 Jalan Woodbridge 799018 Singapore / KR | 04 /
Mosely, Roderick C. 4337 Diavila Avenue Pleasanton California 94588 / US | 05 /
Littau, Karl 3278 Bryant Street Palo Alto California 94303 / US | 06 /
Raaijmakers, Ivo 2741 East Bighorn Avenue Phoenix Arizona 85048 / US | 07 /
Smith, David C. 3452 Wheeling Drive Santa Clara California 95051 / US | [1998/03] | Representative(s) | Bayliss, Geoffrey Cyril, et al BOULT WADE TENNANT Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1998/03] | Bayliss, Geoffrey Cyril, et al BOULT WADE TENNANT, 27 Furnival Street London EC4A 1PQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 97305021.4 | 09.07.1997 | [1998/03] | Priority number, date | US19960677218 | 09.07.1996 Original published format: US 677218 | US19960677185 | 09.07.1996 Original published format: US 677185 | US19960680913 | 12.07.1996 Original published format: US 680913 | US19970810221 | 28.02.1997 Original published format: US 810221 | [1998/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0818560 | Date: | 14.01.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/03] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0818560 | Date: | 03.01.2001 | [2001/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.11.2000 | Classification | IPC: | C23C16/56, C23C16/34, C23C16/52, H01L21/318, H01L21/324 | [1998/03] | CPC: |
H01L21/76864 (EP,US);
C23C16/34 (EP,US);
C23C16/45565 (EP,US);
C23C16/4581 (EP,US);
C23C16/4586 (EP,US);
C23C16/481 (EP,US);
C23C16/5096 (EP,US);
C23C16/56 (EP,US);
H01J37/32174 (EP,US);
H01L21/28512 (EP,US);
H01L21/76843 (EP,US);
H01L21/76856 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB [2001/38] |
Former [1998/03] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Herstellung eines Films auf einem Halbleiterscheibchen | [1998/03] | English: | Construction of a film on a semiconductor wafer | [1998/03] | French: | Fabrication d'un film sur une tranche semi-conductrice | [1998/03] | Examination procedure | 02.07.2001 | Examination requested [2001/35] | 03.02.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.06.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.09.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.01.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.01.2009 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2009/28] | 22.01.2009 | Date of oral proceedings | 18.02.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2009/28] | 18.02.2009 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.08.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 01.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 04.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 09.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 08.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 10.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 04.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 10.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 01.08.2000 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   07.08.2000 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]JPH06120152 ; | [XA]EP0711846 (APPLIED MATERIALS INC [US]) [X] 13-15 * page 6, line 23 - line 41; claims 1-9 * [A] 1-12,16-63; | [A]EP0477990 (APPLIED MATERIALS INC [US]) [A] 1-12,36-45,55,56 * column 1, line 42 - column 2, line 2 * * column 5, line 3 - column 6, line 6 *; | [PX]GB2299345 (HYUNDAI ELECTRONICS IND [KR]) [PX] 1,12 * page 2, line 21 - page 3, line 23 *; | [A]DE4342047 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [A] 21-35,46-54,60-63 * claims 1-5,9-11 *; | [A]US5232871 (HO HUEI-MIN [US]) [A] 13-20,57-59 * column 7, line 28 - column 8, line 40; claims 1-8 * | [XA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19940727), vol. 018, no. 403, Database accession no. (E - 1584), & JP06120152 A 19940428 (NIPPONDENSO CO LTD) [X] 1 * abstract * [A] 36,40,55 |