EP0819533 - A method for standardizing an ink jet jet recording head and an ink jet recording head for attaining such standardization, ink jet recording method, and information processing apparatus, and host apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 23.07.2004 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.07.2004 | Refusal of application | published on 08.09.2004 [2004/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1998/04] | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Asakawa, Yoshie 8248-7, Oazahotaka, Hotakamachi Minami Azumi-gun, Nagano-ken / JP | 02 /
Tajika, Hiroshi Canon Kabushiki Kaisha, 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | 03 /
Shiga, Mikio Canon Kabushiki Kaisha, 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | 04 /
Ishinaga, Hiroyuki Canon Kabushiki Kaisha, 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | 05 /
Matsui, Shinya Canon Kabushiki Kaisha, 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | 06 /
Nagatomo, Akira Canon Kabushiki Kaisha, 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | 07 /
Kashino, Toshio Canon Kabushiki Kaisha, 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | 08 /
Kono, Tetsushi Canon Kabushiki Kaisha, 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | [1998/04] | Representative(s) | Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis, et al Beresford Crump LLP 16 High Holborn London WC1V 6BX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1998/04] | Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis, et al BERESFORD & Co. 2-5 Warwick Court High Holborn London WC1R 5DJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 97305134.5 | 11.07.1997 | [1998/04] | Priority number, date | JP19960183855 | 12.07.1996 Original published format: JP 18385596 | JP19960183856 | 12.07.1996 Original published format: JP 18385696 | [1998/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0819533 | Date: | 21.01.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/04] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0819533 | Date: | 25.11.1998 | [1998/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.10.1998 | Classification | IPC: | B41J2/05, B41J2/14, B41J25/34 | [1998/47] | CPC: |
B41J2/04563 (EP,US);
B41J2/0458 (EP,US);
B41J2/04591 (EP,US);
B41J2/04593 (EP,US);
B41J2/14048 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1998/04] | B41J2/05, B41J2/14 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1999/31] |
Former [1998/04] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Standardisierung eines Tintenstrahlaufzeichnungskopfes und Tintenstrahlaufzeichnungskopf zum Erreichen einer solchen Standardisierung, Tintenstrahlaufzeichnungsverfahren, Datenverarbeitungsvorrichtung und Host-Vorrichtung | [1998/04] | English: | A method for standardizing an ink jet jet recording head and an ink jet recording head for attaining such standardization, ink jet recording method, and information processing apparatus, and host apparatus | [1998/04] | French: | Procédé de standardisation d'une tête d'enregistrement à jet d'encre et tête d'enregistrement à jet d'encre pour atteindre une telle standardisation, procédé d'enregistrement à jet d'encre, appareil de traitement d'information et appareil hôte | [1998/04] | Examination procedure | 09.04.1999 | Examination requested [1999/23] | 21.05.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.03.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.08.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.03.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 28.04.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.03.2004 | Date of oral proceedings | 06.04.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2004/37] | 16.04.2004 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2004/37] | 28.04.2004 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Request for further processing for: | 28.04.2003 | Request for further processing filed | 28.04.2003 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 16.05.2003 | Decision despatched | 27.03.2002 | Request for further processing filed | 27.03.2002 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 23.04.2002 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.07.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US5235351 (KOIZUMI YUTAKA [JP]) [X] 1,2,6-9,12,15,17,40,42 * the whole document * [Y] 10,21,25,29,34; | [X]EP0650837 (HEWLETT PACKARD CO [US]) [X] 1,2,6-12 * the whole document *; | [X]WO8802310 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [X] 1 * the whole document *; | [XY]JPH06155758 ; | [X]EP0560562 (CANON KK [JP]) [X] 1,13,14,17,19,39-42 * the whole document *; | [PY]EP0765754 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD [JP]) [PY] 21,25,29 * the whole document *; | [PY]EP0765762 (LEXMARK INT INC [US]) [PY] 10 * the whole document *; | [PX]EP0769381 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [PX] 1 * the whole document *; | [X]EP0571093 (HEWLETT PACKARD CO [US]) [X] 1,2,6-9 * the whole document *; | [X]EP0315417 (HEWLETT PACKARD CO [US]) [X] 1,2,6-9 * the whole document *; | [A]US5278585 (KARZ ROBERT S [US], et al) [A] 3,4 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0436047 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 3,4 * the whole document *; | [A]JPH05124189 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [A] 3,4 * the whole document *; | [A]US5033887 (BAEUERLE RALPH [DE]) [A] 1-42 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0627323 (CANON KK [JP]) [A] 1,2,7-12,14 * the whole document * | [XY] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19940907), vol. 018, no. 479, Database accession no. (M - 1669), & JP06155758 A 19940603 (SEIKO EPSON CORP) [X] 42 * abstract * [Y] 21,34 |