EP0818651 - Method for reducing odorant depletion [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.07.2006 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 20.08.2008 [2008/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Champion Technologies, Inc. 3130 FM 521 Fresno Texas 77545 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1998/03] | For all designated states Champion Technologies, Inc. 3130 FM 521 Fresno, Texas 77545 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Naraghi, Ali 3614 Oakwick Forest Drive Missouri City, Texas 77459 / US | [1998/03] | Representative(s) | Goddard, David John, et al Harrison Goddard Foote LLP 4th Floor, Merchant Exchange 17-19 Whitworth Street West Manchester M1 5WG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/34] | Goddard, David John, et al Harrison Goddard Foote Orlando House 11C Compstall Road Marple Bridge Stockport SK6 5HH / GB | ||
Former [1998/03] | Goddard, David John, et al HARRISON GODDARD FOOTE Vine House 22 Hollins Lane Marple Bridge Stockport SK6 5BB / GB | Application number, filing date | 97305421.6 | 09.07.1997 | [1998/03] | Priority number, date | US19960677891 | 10.07.1996 Original published format: US 677891 | [1998/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0818651 | Date: | 14.01.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/03] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0818651 | Date: | 23.09.1998 | [1998/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.08.1998 | Classification | IPC: | F17C1/10, F17C13/00 | [1998/03] | CPC: |
F17C13/00 (EP,US);
C09K15/322 (EP,US);
C23F11/00 (EP,US);
F17C1/10 (EP,US);
F17C2221/035 (EP,US);
F17C2223/0153 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, NL, SE [1999/23] |
Former [1999/22] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC | ||
Former [1998/03] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Verminderug der Depletion eines Riechstoffes | [1998/03] | English: | Method for reducing odorant depletion | [1998/03] | French: | Procédé pour diminuer la déplétion d'une matière odorante | [1998/03] | Examination procedure | 25.02.1999 | Examination requested [1999/17] | 24.03.1999 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 02.07.1999 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) LU, MC, PT | 01.02.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/34] | 10.04.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2006/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.07.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 23.04.1999 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 23.04.1999 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 23.04.1999 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2005 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4304804 (FITKO CHESTER W); | [Y]US4328003 (RYER JACK, et al) [Y] 3,5 * claim - *; | [Y]US4578208 (GEKE JUEERGEN [DE], et al) [Y] 1,2,5 * claim - *; | [Y]US4701303 (NEVERS ASHLEY D [US]) [Y] 1,2,5,3,5 * claim - * |