EP0822318 - Improvements in or relating to rotary drill bits [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.04.2003 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.04.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 28.05.2003 [2003/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Camco International (UK) Limited Hycalog, Oldends Lane Industrial Estate Stonehouse Gloucestershire GL10 3RQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1998/06] | For all designated states Camco International (UK) Limited Hycalog, Oldends Lane Industrial Estate Stonehouse, Gloucestershire GL10 3RQ / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Beaton, Timothy P. 9525 Ella Lee Lane No. 229 Houston, Texas 77063 / US | [1998/06] | Representative(s) | Carter, Gerald Arthur R. Davies & Co. 27 Imperial Square Cheltenham, Gloucestershire GL50 1RQ / GB | [1998/06] | Application number, filing date | 97305481.0 | 22.07.1997 | [1998/06] | Priority number, date | US19960022922P | 01.08.1996 Original published format: US 22922 P | [1998/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0822318 | Date: | 04.02.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0822318 | Date: | 05.06.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.11.1997 | Classification | IPC: | E21B10/46, E21B10/56 | [1998/06] | CPC: |
E21B10/567 (EP,US);
E21B10/46 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE [1998/42] |
Former [1998/06] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verbesserungen an Drehbohrmeisseln | [1998/06] | English: | Improvements in or relating to rotary drill bits | [1998/06] | French: | Perfectionnements aux trépans de forage rotatifs | [1998/06] | Examination procedure | 16.07.1998 | Examination requested [1998/38] | 08.08.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.10.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.04.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.08.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.10.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 29.11.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.02.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 07.02.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.03.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.07.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.08.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 01.08.2000 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   16.08.2000 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US3885637 (VEPRINTSEV VLADIMIR IVANOVICH, et al) [Y] 1-6,10-12 * column 2, line 42 - line 67 * * figure - *; | [A]US4200159 (JURGENS RAINER [DE], et al); | [Y]US4266621 (BROCK KENNETH A) [Y] 1-7,10,12 * column 3, line 44 - column 4, line 24 * * figures 4,5 *; | [A]US4351401 (FIELDER COY M) [A] 1 * column 6, line 9 - line 26 * * figures 2,12 *; | [Y]EP0314953 (REED TOOL CO [GB]) [Y] 1-7,10,12 * the whole document *; | [Y] - R.J. GENTGES, "Proper bit design improves penetration rate in abrasive horiz. wells", OIL & GAS JOURNAL, (19930809), vol. 91, no. 32, pages 39 - 42, XP000395481 [Y] 1-6,10-12 * page 40, column 3, paragraph 2 - column 4, paragraph 3 * * page 42, column 1, paragraph 2 - paragraph 6; figures 1-5 * |