EP0823786 - Pseudo differential bus driver/receiver for field programmable devices [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 03.09.1999 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.09.1999 | Withdrawal of application | published on 20.10.1999 [1999/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Company 3000 Hanover Street Palo Alto, CA 94304-1112 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1998/07] | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Company 3000 Hanover Street Palo Alto, California 94304 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Perner, Frederick A. 3234 Ramona Street Palo Alto, California 94306 / US | [1998/07] | Representative(s) | Jehan, Robert, et al Williams Powell 44 Prospect Place Bromley, Kent BR2 9HN / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1998/07] | Jehan, Robert, et al Williams, Powell & Associates, 34 Tavistock Street London WC2E 7PB / GB | Application number, filing date | 97305909.0 | 04.08.1997 | [1998/07] | Priority number, date | US19960694891 | 08.08.1996 Original published format: US 694891 | [1998/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0823786 | Date: | 11.02.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/07] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0823786 | Date: | 25.11.1998 | [1998/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.10.1998 | Classification | IPC: | H03K19/0175 | [1998/07] | CPC: |
H03K19/018528 (EP,US);
H03K19/01855 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1999/31] |
Former [1998/07] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Pseudo-differentieller Bustreiber/-empfänger für feldprogrammierbare Schaltungen | [1998/07] | English: | Pseudo differential bus driver/receiver for field programmable devices | [1998/07] | French: | Circuit d'attaque et de réception pseudo-différentiel pour dispositifs programmables par l'utilisateur | [1998/07] | Examination procedure | 25.05.1999 | Examination requested [1999/29] | 30.08.1999 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1999/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.07.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0410908 (SGS THOMSON MICROELECTRONICS [FR]) [A] 1,8; | [A]US5283482 (CHEN DAO-LONG [US])[A] 1,8; | [A]US5469382 (YERO EMILIO [FR]) [A] 1,8 |