EP0827280 - Pulse generator [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 31.12.2004 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.12.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.02.2005 [2005/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS MEDICAL SYSTEMS, INC. 186 Wood Avenue South Iselin New Jersey 08830 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1998/10] | For all designated states SIEMENS MEDICAL SYSTEMS, INC. 186 Wood Avenue South Iselin, New Jersey 08830 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hitchcock, Roger 1614 Graff Avenue San Leandro, CA 94577 / US | 02 /
Marziale, Michael 988 St Andrews Drive El Sobrante, CA 94803 / US | 03 /
Thompson, Lance 1366 Chapel Avenue San Leandro, CA 94579 / US | [1998/10] | Representative(s) | Fenlon, Christine Lesley, et al Haseltine Lake LLP Lincoln House, 5th Floor 300 High Holborn London WC1V 7JH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1998/10] | Fenlon, Christine Lesley, et al Haseltine Lake & Co., Imperial House, 15-19 Kingsway London WC2B 6UD / GB | Application number, filing date | 97306111.2 | 12.08.1997 | [1998/10] | Priority number, date | US19960704054 | 28.08.1996 Original published format: US 704054 | [1998/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0827280 | Date: | 04.03.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/10] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0827280 | Date: | 15.12.1999 | [1999/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.10.1999 | Classification | IPC: | H03K17/567, H03K3/57, A61N5/10 | [1998/10] | CPC: |
H03K17/105 (EP,US);
H02M7/10 (KR);
H03K17/567 (EP,US);
H03K17/601 (EP,US);
H03K3/57 (EP,US);
A61N5/10 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2000/34] |
Former [1998/10] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Pulsgenerator | [1998/10] | English: | Pulse generator | [1998/10] | French: | Générateur d'impulsions | [1998/10] | Examination procedure | 30.05.2000 | Examination requested [2000/30] | 11.07.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.11.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.03.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.08.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/07] | 14.09.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2005/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.08.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.08.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2004 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3571611 (ROBINSON TREVOR HOWARD, et al) [A] 1* column 1; figure 2 *; | [A]EP0398526 (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG [US]) [A] 1-20 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0465065 (VARIAN ASSOCIATES [US]) [A] 1-20 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0517226 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO [JP]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [XA] - RICHARDSON R ET AL, "MODERN PULSED MAGNETRON TRANSMITTERS FOR AIR TRAFFIC CONTROL APPLICATIONS", PROCEEDINGS OF THE POWER MODULATOR SYMPOSIUM, MYRTLE BEACH, SOUTH CAROLINA, JUNE 23 - 25, 1992, INSTITUTE OF ELECTRICAL AND ELECTRONICS ENGINEERS, (19920623), no. SYMP. 20, ISBN 0-7803-0718-6, pages 19 - 22, XP000350375 [X] 1-6,12-14,17,18 * the whole document * [A] 16,19,20 | [A] - "Fast Switching Thyristors Replace Thyratrons in High-Current Pulse Applications", BROWN BOVERI REVIEW, Baden, CH, (198707), vol. 74, no. 7, pages 401 - 408, XP002115684 [A] 1 * the whole document * |