EP0826798 - Heteroepitaxy cyclic texture growth method for diamond film [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.07.2003 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.07.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.09.2003 [2003/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416 Maetan-dong Paldal-gu Suwon City, Kyungki-do / KR | [N/P] |
Former [1998/10] | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416 Maetan-dong, Paldal-gu Suwon City, Kyungki-do / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kim, Sung-hoon 104-1503 Hansung Apt. 698-2 Pungdukchun-ri Suji-eup, Yongin-city, Kyungki-do / KR | 02 /
Park, Young-soo 104-103 Hanyan Apt., 396 Gugal-ri Kiheung-eub, Yongin-city, Kyungki-do / KR | 03 /
Han, In-taek 90-102 Siyoung Apt Shincheon-dong, Songpa-gu, Seoul / KR | 04 /
Lee, Jo-won 101-104 Hyundai Apt. Maetan-dong, Paldal-gu, Suwon-city / KR | [1998/10] | Representative(s) | Kyle, Diana Elkington and Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1998/10] | Kyle, Diana Elkington and Fife Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | Application number, filing date | 97306534.5 | 27.08.1997 | [1998/10] | Priority number, date | KR19960035885 | 27.08.1996 Original published format: KR 9635885 | KR19960051444 | 31.10.1996 Original published format: KR 9651444 | KR19970036859 | 01.08.1997 Original published format: KR 9736859 | [1998/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0826798 | Date: | 04.03.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/10] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0826798 | Date: | 27.10.1999 | [1999/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.09.1999 | Classification | IPC: | C30B25/02, C30B29/04, C30B25/18, C30B25/10, C23C16/26 | [1999/43] | CPC: |
C30B25/02 (EP);
C30B25/105 (EP);
C30B29/04 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1998/10] | C30B25/02, C30B29/04, C30B25/18 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [2000/27] |
Former [1998/10] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Züchtung eines Diamantfilmes durch eine zyklische texturierte heteroepitaktische Methode | [1998/10] | English: | Heteroepitaxy cyclic texture growth method for diamond film | [1998/10] | French: | Méthode de croissance hétéro-épitaxiale du type texture cyclique d'un film diamant | [1998/10] | Examination procedure | 29.03.2000 | Examination requested [2000/21] | 01.03.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/37] | 09.04.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2003/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.08.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.08.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2002 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US5516554 (GASWORTH STEVEN M) [X] 1,8,9 * column 10, line 40 - column 11; figure 7 * [Y] 11-16; | [Y]US5479875 (TACHIBANA TAKESHI ET AL) [Y] 11-16 * claims 1-3 *; | [X]US5261959 (GASWORTH STEVEN M) [X] 1,8,9 * column 11, line 43 - line 53 *; | [A]JPH04240190 ; | [A]WO9313242 (UNIV NORTH CAROLINA ;UNIV NORTH CAROLINA (US)) [A] 11,15,16 * example 6 *; | [A]WO9408076 (FRAUNHOFER GES FORSCHUNG ;DAIMLER BENZ AG (DE); KLAGES CLAUS PETER) [A] 11 * claims 1,6 *; | [A]JPH03257098 | [PX] - LEE J -W ET AL, "Cyclic technique for the enhancement of highly oriented diamond film growth", THIN SOLID FILMS, (19970715), vol. 303, no. 1-2, ISSN 0040-6090, page 264-268, XP004087644 [PX] 1-8,10-12,15,16 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0040-6090(97)00025-4 | [PX] - KIM S H ET AL, "EFFECT OF THE CYCLIC GROWTH/ETCHING TIME RATIO ON THE 100 -ORIENTED TEXTURE GROWTH OF A DIAMOND FILM", THIN SOLID FILMS, (19961215), vol. 290/291, ISSN 0040-6090, pages 161 - 164, XP000693822 [PX] 1-8,10-12,15,16 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0040-6090(96)09191-2 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19930108), vol. 017, no. 011, Database accession no. (C - 1015), & JP04240190 A 19920827 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP) [A] 1,11 * abstract * | [A] - KIM Y -K ET AL, "TEXTURE-CONTROLLED DIAMOND FILMS SYNTHESIZED BY MICROWAVE PLASMA -ENHANCED CHEMICAL VAPOUR DEPOSITION", THIN SOLID FILMS, (19960101), vol. 272, no. 1, ISSN 0040-6090, pages 64 - 70, XP000623628 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0040-6090(95)06973-9 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19920217), vol. 016, no. 061, Database accession no. (C - 0910), & JP03257098 A 19911115 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [A] * abstract * |