Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP3309774B | Global Dossier | 29.07.2002 | B2 | JPH10310422 | 24.11.1998 | A | Priority number | Date | JP23191097 | 28.08.1997 | JP22967696 | 30.08.1996 | JP31961996 | 29.11.1996 | JP5471097 | 10.03.1997 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0826631 | Global Dossier | 05.12.2001 | B1 | EP0826631 | 04.03.1998 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP22967696 | 30.08.1996 | JP31961996 | 29.11.1996 | JP5471097 | 10.03.1997 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69708790T | 08.08.2002 | T2 | DE69708790D1 | 17.01.2002 | D1 | Priority number | Date | JP22967696 | 30.08.1996 | JP31961996 | 29.11.1996 | JP5471097 | 10.03.1997 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6036939 | 14.03.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | JP22967696 | 30.08.1996 | JP31961996 | 29.11.1996 | JP5471097 | 10.03.1997 |