EP0826631 - Heat-resistant low-silica zeolite, and process for production and application thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.10.2002 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.10.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 27.11.2002 [2002/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TOSOH CORPORATION 4560, Kaisei-cho Shinnanyo-shi, Yamaguchi-ken / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1998/10] | For all designated states TOSOH CORPORATION 4560, Kasei-cho Shinnanyo-shi, Yamaguchi-ken / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Funakoshi, Hajime 4-10-3-314, Madokoro Shinnanyo-shi, Yamaguchi / JP | 02 /
Shirakura, Yoshinori 1-4-3-202, Muroo Shinnanyo-shi, Yamaguchi / JP | 03 /
Yatsunami, Shunsuke 2-6-10, Miyanomae Shinnanyo-shi, Yamaguchi / JP | 04 /
Yamamoto, Kazuaki 214-8, Oazashimokami Tokuyama-shi, Yamaguchi / JP | 05 /
Ogawa, Nobuhiro 3-1-2-519, Fukue Ichikawa-shi, Chiba / JP | 06 /
Mori, Takashi 2-9-27, Nijigahama Hikari-shi, Yamaguchi / JP | 07 /
Harada, Atsushi 4-5-5-203, Madokoro Shinnanyo-shi, Yamaguchi / JP | [1998/10] | Representative(s) | Kearney, Kevin David Nicholas, et al KILBURN & STRODE 20 Red Lion Street London, WC1R 4PJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1998/10] | Kearney, Kevin David Nicholas, et al KILBURN & STRODE 30 John Street London, WC1N 2DD / GB | Application number, filing date | 97306575.8 | 28.08.1997 | [1998/10] | Priority number, date | JP19960229676 | 30.08.1996 Original published format: JP 22967696 | JP19960319619 | 29.11.1996 Original published format: JP 31961996 | JP19970054710 | 10.03.1997 Original published format: JP 5471097 | [1998/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0826631 | Date: | 04.03.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0826631 | Date: | 05.12.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.12.1997 | Classification | IPC: | C01B39/22, C01B13/02, B01J20/18, B01D53/02 | [1998/10] | CPC: |
B01D53/02 (EP,US);
B01J20/186 (EP,US);
C01B13/027 (EP,US);
C01B39/22 (EP,US);
B01D2253/1085 (EP,US);
B01D2253/25 (EP,US);
B01D2253/306 (EP,US);
B01D2256/12 (EP,US);
B01D2257/102 (EP,US);
B01D53/047 (EP,US);
C01B2210/0046 (EP,US);
Y02C20/40 (EP,US);
Y10S423/21 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1998/47] |
Former [1998/10] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Wärmebeständiges Zeolith mit niedrigem Kieselsäuregehalt und Verfahren zu dessen Herstellung und Verwendung | [1998/10] | English: | Heat-resistant low-silica zeolite, and process for production and application thereof | [1998/10] | French: | Zéolithe à faible teneur en silice thermiquement stable, son procédé de préparation et son utilisation | [1998/10] | Examination procedure | 21.04.1998 | Examination requested [1998/25] | 18.11.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.05.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.02.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 15.03.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 28.03.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.04.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 12.04.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.09.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.08.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.08.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]US4859217 (CHAO CHIEN C [US]) [DA] 1,3,7,8,10 * the whole document *; | [DA]US5268023 (KIRNER JOHN F [US]) [DA] 1,3,7,8,10 * the whole document *; | [A]US5366720 (CAGLIONE ALEX J [US], et al) [A] 1,2 * column 1, line 7 - line 17 *; | [A]FR2105451 (ALSACE MINES POTASSE) [A] 1,2 * claim 6 * * page 4, line 1 - line 6 *; | [A]US4481018 (COE CHARLES G [US], et al) [A] 1,9 * claims 1,12,13 *; | [A]WO9602462 (ALBEMARLE CORP [US]) [A] 3 * page 7, line 30 - page 8, line 25 * | [DA] - GÜNTER H. KÜHL, "Crystallisation of low-silica faujasite (SiO2/Al2O3 .apprx. 2.0)", ZEOLITES, (19870107), vol. 7, no. 7, pages 451 - 457, XP000562955 [DA] 1-7 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0144-2449(87)90014-5 |