EP0831584 - Amplifier system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.05.2003 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.05.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.07.2003 [2003/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nokia Corporation Keilalahdentie 4 02150 Espoo / FI | [2002/11] |
Former [1998/13] | For all designated states NOKIA MOBILE PHONES LTD. Keilalahdentie 4 02150 Espoo / FI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Samuels, John 91 Bishops Wood Goldsworth Park, Woking, GU21 3QD / GB | [1998/13] | Representative(s) | Haws, Helen Louise Nokia IPR Department Nokia (UK) Limited Summit Avenue Southwood Farnborough Hampshire GU14 0NZ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1998/13] | Haws, Helen Louise Nokia Mobile Phones, St. George's Court, St. George's Road Camberley, Surrey GU15 3QZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 97306617.8 | 29.08.1997 | [1998/13] | Priority number, date | GB19960019705 | 20.09.1996 Original published format: GB 9619705 | [1998/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0831584 | Date: | 25.03.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0831584 | Date: | 24.07.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.11.1997 | Classification | IPC: | H03F1/32, H03F3/191, H03G3/30 | [1998/13] | CPC: |
H03G3/3036 (EP,KR,US);
H03F1/3241 (EP,KR,US);
H03F3/191 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1998/50] |
Former [1998/13] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verstärkersystem | [1998/13] | English: | Amplifier system | [1998/13] | French: | Système amplificateur | [1998/13] | Examination procedure | 25.09.1998 | Examination requested [1998/48] | 02.08.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.03.2001 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 15.05.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.09.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 21.01.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.03.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 18.03.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.04.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/29] | Request for further processing for: | 15.05.2001 | Request for further processing filed | 15.05.2001 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 01.06.2001 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.08.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.08.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US3671886 (FUDEMOTO ISAO, et al) [X] 1 * column 2, line 45 - column 3, line 47; figure 3 * [A] 3,4,8-13; | [A]US4409557 (SECHI FRANCO N [US]) [A] 2,5 * column 2, line 17 - column 3, line 3; figure 1 *; | [A]DE1908924 (PHILIPS NV) [A] 1-5 * page 16, line 15 - page 20, line 12; figures 1,3 * | [A] - BUOLI C ET AL, "ADAPTIVE COMPENSATION FOR MICROWAVE LINEARIZER", PROCEEDINGS OF THE 23RD. EUROPEAN MICROWAVE CONFERENCE, MADRID, SEPT. 6 - 9, 1993, EUROPEAN MICROWAVE CONFERENCE MANAGEMENT COMMITTEE, (19930906), pages 439 - 442, XP000629958 [A] 1,3,4,8,9 * page 440; figure 4 * |