EP0828227 - Print system, printer driver and printer [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.09.2004 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.09.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 10.11.2004 [2004/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Seiko Epson Corporation 4-1, Nishi-Shinjuku 2-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1998/11] | For all designated states SEIKO EPSON CORPORATION 4-1, Nishi-Shinjuku 2-chome Shinjuku-ku, Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ishida, Goro c/o Seiko Epson Corporation, 3-5, Owa 3-chome Suwa-shi, Nagano / JP | 02 /
Matsuhira, Masatoshi c/o Seiko Epson Corporation, 3-5, Owa 3-chome Suwa-shi, Nagano / JP | [1998/11] | Representative(s) | Sturt, Clifford Mark, et al Miller Sturt Kenyon 9 John Street London WC1N 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1998/11] | Sturt, Clifford Mark, et al J. MILLER & CO. 34 Bedford Row, Holborn London WC1R 4JH / GB | Application number, filing date | 97306795.2 | 02.09.1997 | [1998/11] | Priority number, date | JP19960232338 | 02.09.1996 Original published format: JP 23233896 | JP19960232339 | 02.09.1996 Original published format: JP 23233996 | [1998/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0828227 | Date: | 11.03.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0828227 | Date: | 19.11.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.01.1998 | Classification | IPC: | G06K15/10 | [1998/11] | CPC: |
G06K15/10 (EP,US);
G06K2215/0077 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1998/48] |
Former [1998/11] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Druckersystem, Druckertreiber und Drucker | [1998/11] | English: | Print system, printer driver and printer | [1998/11] | French: | Système d'impression, driver d'imprimante et imprimante | [1998/11] | Examination procedure | 26.08.1998 | Examination requested [1998/43] | 21.02.2000 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.04.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.08.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.09.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.01.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.05.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.09.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 22.09.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.08.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.09.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0378759 (HEWLETT PACKARD CO [US]) [Y] 1,2,10-12 * figure 1 * * column 2, line 43 - column 3, line 1 *; | [Y]EP0578434 (CANON KK [JP]) [Y] 1,2,10-12 * figure 3 * * column 12, line 13 - line 53 *; | [A]EP0685820 (CANON KK [JP]) [A] 1,2,10-12 * figures 3-6 * * column 6, line 44 - column 9, line 15 * |