EP0845858 - Surface acoustic wave device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.03.2007 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.03.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 25.04.2007 [2007/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2006/17] | For all designated states FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | ||
Former [1998/23] | For all designated states FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ueda, Masanori c/o Fujitsu Limited, 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome Nakahara-ku, Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211 / JP | 02 /
Kawachi, Osamu c/o Fujitsu Limited, 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome Nakahara-ku, Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211 / JP | 03 /
Endoh, Gou c/o Fujitsu Limited, 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome Nakahara-ku, Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211 / JP | 04 /
Fujiwara, Yoshiro c/o Fujitsu Limited, 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome Nakahara-ku, Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211 / JP | [1998/23] | Representative(s) | Williams, Michael Ian, et al Haseltine Lake LLP Lincoln House, 5th Floor 300 High Holborn London WC1V 7JH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/06] | Williams, Michael Ian, et al Haseltine Lake Imperial House 15-19 Kingsway London WC2B 6UD / GB | ||
Former [1998/23] | Godsill, John Kenneth, et al Haseltine Lake & Co., Imperial House, 15-19 Kingsway London WC2B 6UD / GB | Application number, filing date | 97306882.8 | 04.09.1997 | [1998/23] | Priority number, date | JP19960318270 | 28.11.1996 Original published format: JP 31827096 | [1998/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0845858 | Date: | 03.06.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/23] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0845858 | Date: | 19.01.2000 | [2000/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0845858 | Date: | 26.04.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.12.1999 | Classification | IPC: | H03H9/02, H03H9/25 | [2000/03] | CPC: |
H03H9/6483 (EP,US);
H03H3/08 (KR);
H03H9/0042 (EP,US);
H03H9/02559 (EP,US);
H03H9/6436 (EP,US);
H03H9/6469 (EP,US);
H03H2250/00 (EP,US);
H03H9/02275 (KR);
H03H9/02921 (KR);
H03H9/14538 (KR)
(-)
|
Former IPC [1998/23] | H03H9/02 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2000/39] |
Former [1998/23] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Akustische Oberflächenwellenanordnung | [1998/23] | English: | Surface acoustic wave device | [1998/23] | French: | Dispositif à ondes acoustiques de surface | [1998/23] | Examination procedure | 13.03.2000 | Examination requested [2000/19] | 31.10.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.02.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 22.02.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.01.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.09.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0569977 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1,6,11,13,17 * page 4, line 33 - line 41; figure 1 *; | [PA]EP0763889 (JAPAN ENERGY CORP [JP]) [PA] 2,3,7,8,11,13,17 * page 5, line 9 - page 6, line 30 *; | [A]WO9628886 (JAPAN ENERGY CORP [JP], et al); | [A]EP0734121 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]) [A] 2,3,7,8,11,13,17 * abstract *; | [A]DE4408989 (FUJITSU LTD [JP]) [A] 4,9,11,13 * column 3, line 14 - line 30 *; | [A]DE4431612 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO [JP]) [A] 5,10-14 * column 9, line 12 - column 10, line 6 * | [A] - ANEMOGIANNIS K ET AL, "NEW SYSTEM APPLICATIONS OF MODERN RF SAW FILTERS", IEEE NTC THE MICROWAVE SYSTEMS CONFERENCE/ NATIONAL TELESYSTEMS CONFERENCE,US,NEW YORK, IEEE, ISBN 0-7803-2594-X, page 195-203, XP000702649 [A] 1,6,11,13,17 * page 198, column R, line 1 - line 17; figure 5 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/NTCMWS.1995.522888 | [DA] - M. UEDA ET AL., "Low Loss Ladder Type SAW Filter in the Range of 300 to 400 MHz", PROCEEDINGS ON ULTRASONICS SYMPOSIUM, New York, US, (1994), pages 143 - 146, XP002124000 [DA] 1,6,11,13,17 * the whole document * | Examination | - TAZIEV R.M.; YAKOVKIN I.B., "Fast algorithm for correction of material constants of piezoelectric crystals on SAW velocity experimental data", PROC. 1994 IEEE ULTRASONICS SYMPOSIUM, (1994), pages 415 - 419, XP010139607 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ULTSYM.1994.401621 |