EP0901125 - Clock recovery for tape data storage system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.05.2000 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.05.2000 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.06.2000 [2000/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Company 3000 Hanover Street Palo Alto, CA 94304-1112 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1999/10] | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Company 3000 Hanover Street Palo Alto, California 94304 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Willcocks, Benjamin Alec 28 Druid Road Bristol BS9 1LH / GB | [1999/10] | Representative(s) | Lawman, Matthew John Mitchell, et al Hewlett-Packard Limited IP Section Building 3 Filton Road, Stoke Gifford Bristol BS34 8QZ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/10] | Lawman, Matthew John Mitchell, et al Hewlett-Packard Limited, IP Section, Building 2, Filton Road Stoke Gifford, Bristol BS12 6QZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 97306960.2 | 08.09.1997 | [1999/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0901125 | Date: | 10.03.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.02.1998 | Classification | IPC: | G11B20/10, G11B20/22 | [1999/10] | CPC: |
G11B20/10259 (EP);
G11B20/1403 (EP);
G11B20/225 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [1999/47] |
Former [1999/10] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Taktrückgewinnung für Datenspeicherungsbandsystem | [1999/10] | English: | Clock recovery for tape data storage system | [1999/10] | French: | Récupération d'horloge pour un système de stockage de données sur bande | [1999/10] | Examination procedure | 11.09.1999 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2000/26] | 17.01.2000 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2000/26] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 22.10.1999 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.1999 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0608014 (PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV) [X] 1-3,5,7-11,13,14 * column 4, line 57 - column 6, line 26; figure 1 * * column 7, line 14 - line 29 *; | [A]EP0557114 (SONY CORP) [A] 1,2,4,5,7,12-14 * column 5, line 11 - column 6, line 40; figures 2,3 *; | [A]US3900890 (EIBNER JULES A) [A] 1,12,14 * column 2, line 5 - line 39 *; | [A]EP0549412 (THOMSON CSF) | [A] - DOYLE W D, "A HIGH CAPACITY, HIGH PERFORMANCE, SMALL FORM FACTOR MAGNETIC TAPE STORAGE SYSTEM", CRISIS IN MASS STORAGE, MONTEREY, MAY 7 - 10, 1990, INSTITUTE OF ELECTRICAL AND ELECTRONICS ENGINEERS, (19900507), no. SYMP. 10, pages 154 - 159, XP000166463 [A] 6 * figure 2 * |