EP0827791 - Wire straightening apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.08.1999 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.08.1999 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.09.1999 [1999/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PAVE AUTOMATION DESIGN AND DEVELOPMENT LIMITED Padholme Road Peterborough, PE1 5XL / GB | [1998/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Perna, Antonio Andrew 14 Lincoln Road Glinton, Peterborough PE1 7JR / GB | [1998/11] | Representative(s) | Roberts, David Leslie Nash Matthews LLP 24 Hills Road Cambridge CB2 1JP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1998/11] | Roberts, David Leslie Keith W. Nash & Co., 90-92 Regent Street Cambridge CB2 1DP / GB | Application number, filing date | 97306961.0 | 08.09.1997 | [1998/11] | Priority number, date | GB19960018892 | 10.09.1996 Original published format: GB 9618892 | [1998/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0827791 | Date: | 11.03.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/11] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0827791 | Date: | 06.05.1998 | [1998/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.03.1998 | Classification | IPC: | B21F1/02 | [1998/11] | CPC: |
B21F1/02 (EP);
B21F1/023 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1999/03] |
Former [1998/11] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Extension states | AL | 02.10.1997 | LT | 02.10.1997 | LV | 02.10.1997 | RO | 02.10.1997 | SI | 02.10.1997 | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Richten von Draht | [1998/11] | English: | Wire straightening apparatus | [1998/11] | French: | Machine à dressage pour fils | [1998/11] | Examination procedure | 07.11.1998 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1999/39] | 26.04.1999 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1999/39] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]GB2229661 (PEDDINGHAUS CARL ULLRICH DR) [X] 1-6 * the whole document * [Y] 10-13,16; | [XY]JPS60170545 ; | [Y]GB719073 (MORRALL) [Y] 16 * page 2, line 50 - line 62 *; | [Y]FR2220325 (BOCCA ET MALANDRONE SPA) [Y] 10-15 * page 4, paragraph 4 *; | [A]US4335758 (WILLIAMS STANLEY E) [A] 17 * column W * | [XY] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19860111), vol. 010, no. 006, Database accession no. (M - 445), & JP60170545 A 19850904 (SHINKOU KOUSEN KOGYO KK) [X] 1,2,5,7-9 * abstract * [Y] 14,15 |