Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP3264839B | Global Dossier | 11.03.2002 | B2 | JPH10106200 | 24.04.1998 | A | Priority number | Date | JP25289096 | 25.09.1996 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0833333 | Global Dossier | 30.05.2001 | B1 | EP0833333 | 01.04.1998 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP25289096 | 25.09.1996 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69705006T | 13.09.2001 | T2 | DE69705006D1 | 05.07.2001 | D1 | Priority number | Date | JP25289096 | 25.09.1996 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR100245486B | 15.02.2000 | B1 | KR19980024983 | 06.07.1998 | A | Priority number | Date | JP25289096 | 25.09.1996 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | TW338827B | 21.08.1998 | B | Priority number | Date | JP25289096 | 25.09.1996 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5959949 | 28.09.1999 | A | Priority number | Date | JP25289096 | 25.09.1996 |