EP0829361 - Homogenizing ink in an ink jet printer [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 02.07.2004 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.07.2004 | Refusal of application | published on 18.08.2004 [2004/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416 Maetan-3 Dong Paldal-gu Suwon City, Kyungki-do 441-373 / KR | [N/P] |
Former [1998/12] | For all designated states SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO., LTD. 416 Maetan-3 Dong, Paldal-ku Suwon-city, Kyungki-do 441-373 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ahn, Byung-Sun Kweonseon 2-cha Apt. No.207-506, Kweonseon-dong Kweonseon-gu, Suwon-city, Kyungki-do / KR | [1998/12] | Representative(s) | Boakes, Jason Carrington Harrison Goddard Foote 106 Micklegate York YO1 6JX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/48] | Boakes, Jason Carrington Harrison Goddard Foote Belgrave Hall Belgrave Street Leeds LS2 8DD / GB | ||
Former [1998/12] | Tunstall, Christopher Stephen Dibb Lupton Alsop, Fountain Precinct Balm Green, Sheffield S1 1RZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 97307173.1 | 16.09.1997 | [1998/12] | Priority number, date | KR19960040193 | 16.09.1996 Original published format: KR 9640193 | [1998/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0829361 | Date: | 18.03.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/12] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0829361 | Date: | 03.03.1999 | [1999/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.01.1999 | Classification | IPC: | B41J2/17 | [1998/12] | CPC: |
B41J2/1707 (EP,US);
B41J2/175 (KR);
B41J2/17503 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1999/46] |
Former [1998/12] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Homogenisieren von Tinte in einem Tintenstrahldrucker | [1998/12] | English: | Homogenizing ink in an ink jet printer | [1998/12] | French: | Homogénéisation de l'encre dans un imprimante à jet d'encre | [1998/12] | Examination procedure | 01.10.1997 | Examination requested [1998/12] | 15.03.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.09.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.03.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.09.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.02.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.06.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.01.2004 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2004/34] | 15.01.2004 | Date of oral proceedings | 12.03.2004 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 22.03.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2004/34] | Request for further processing for: | 30.09.2002 | Request for further processing filed | 30.09.2002 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 14.10.2002 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.08.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.08.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 08.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPS6322655 ; | [A]JPH04216940 ; | [A]JPS60232962 ; | [A]JPS60110458 ; | [A]JPH05338195 ; | [A]EP0307160 (DATAPRODUCTS CORP [US]) [A] 2 * abstract * * column 10, line 12 - line 46 * * figure -; claim - * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19880628), vol. 012, no. 227, Database accession no. (M - 713), & JP63022655 A 19880130 (RICOH CO LTD) [X] 1,3,4,6,8,10 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19921204), vol. 016, no. 563, Database accession no. (M - 1342), & JP04216940 A 19920807 (SEIKO EPSON CORP) [A] 2 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19860412), vol. 010, no. 096, Database accession no. (M - 469), & JP60232962 A 19851119 (CANON KK) [A] 1-6,8,10 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19851022), vol. 009, no. 264, Database accession no. (M - 423), & JP60110458 A 19850615 (HITACHI SEISAKUSHO KK) [A] 2 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19940324), vol. 018, no. 173, Database accession no. (M - 1581), & JP05338195 A 19931221 (SEIKO EPSON CORP) [A] 1-6,8,10 * abstract * |