EP0831300 - Capacitance-type displacement measuring device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.02.2004 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.02.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 31.03.2004 [2004/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mitutoyo Corporation 20-1, Sakado 1-chome Takatsu-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1998/13] | For all designated states Mitutoyo Corporation 20-1, Sakado 1-chome, Takatsu-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Suzuki, Masamichi c/o Mitutoyo Corporation, 20-1, Sakado 1-chome Takatsu-ku, Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | 02 /
Takahashi, Seigo c/o Mitutoyo Corporation, 20-1, Sakado 1-chome Takatsu-ku, Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | [1998/13] | Representative(s) | Skone James, Robert Edmund Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/12] | Skone James, Robert Edmund GILL JENNINGS & EVERY Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | ||
Former [1998/13] | Jackson, Peter Arthur GILL JENNINGS & EVERY Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 97307222.6 | 17.09.1997 | [1998/13] | Priority number, date | JP19960249898 | 20.09.1996 Original published format: JP 24989896 | [1998/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0831300 | Date: | 25.03.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/13] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0831300 | Date: | 15.04.1998 | [1998/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0831300 | Date: | 09.04.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.02.1998 | Classification | IPC: | G01D5/24, G01B3/18, G01D5/241, G01B7/30 | [1998/16] | CPC: |
G01D5/2415 (EP,US);
G01B3/18 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1998/13] | G01D5/24, G01B3/18 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1999/01] |
Former [1998/13] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Kapazitive Wegmesseinrichtung | [1998/13] | English: | Capacitance-type displacement measuring device | [1998/13] | French: | Capteur de déplacement de type capacitif | [2002/36] |
Former [1998/13] | Capteur de déplacement du type capacitif | Examination procedure | 30.09.1998 | Examination requested [1998/48] | 13.03.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.07.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.08.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.12.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 06.12.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.01.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.09.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]US4578868 (SASAKI KOHJI [JP], et al) [Y] 1,2,4,5,9,10 * column 1, line 62 - column 2, line 64; figures 3-6 * * column 6, line 31 - column 8, line 41 * [A] 3,4; | [YA]US5172485 (GERHARD GREGORY J [US], et al) [Y] 1,2,4,5,9,10 * column 1, line 1 - column 2, line 68 * * column 6, line 43 - column 11, line 26; figures 2-5 * [A] 6-8,11-13; | [A]GB2264784 (KANSEI KK [JP]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [DY]EP0716290 (MITUTOYO CORP [JP]) [DY] 1,2,4,5,9,10 * the whole document *; | [PA]EP0791801 (MITUTOYO CORP [JP]) [PA] 1,9* the whole document * |