EP0832626 - Ostomy appliance and contoured adhesive wafer therefor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 12.05.2006 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.07.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 22.08.2007 [2007/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HOLLISTER INCORPORATED 2000 Hollister Drive Libertyville Illinois 60048-3781 / US | [2006/24] |
Former [2003/11] | For all designated states Hollister Incorporated 2000 Hollister Drive Libertyville, Illinois 60048-3781 / US | ||
Former [1998/14] | For all designated states HOLLISTER INCORPORATED 2000 Hollister Drive Libertyville Illinois 60048 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sawers, Michael F. 10 Park Lane Woodstock ELX20 1UD / GB | 02 /
Gilman, Thomas H. 10819 Rudolph Court Spring Grove, Illinois 60081 / US | 03 /
Schneider, Barry L. 2202 Bay Oaks Drive McHenry, Illinois 60050 / US | 04 /
Ellington, Eric D. 121 North Russel Street Mount Prospect, Illinois 60056 / US | 05 /
Botten, Ronald S. 6842 West Mount Vernon Court Gurnee, Illinois 60031 / US | [1998/14] | Representative(s) | Kensett, John Hinton Saunders & Dolleymore LLP 9 Rickmansworth Road Watford WD18 0JU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1998/14] | Kensett, John Hinton Saunders & Dolleymore, 9 Rickmansworth Road Watford, Hertfordshire WD1 7HE / GB | Application number, filing date | 97307267.1 | 18.09.1997 | [1998/14] | Priority number, date | US19960718955 | 26.09.1996 Original published format: US 718955 | [1998/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0832626 | Date: | 01.04.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/14] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0832626 | Date: | 18.08.1999 | [1999/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0832626 | Date: | 12.03.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/11] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP0832626 | Date: | 14.06.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.07.1999 | Classification | IPC: | A61F5/445, A61F5/443, A61F13/02 | [1999/33] | CPC: |
A61F5/443 (EP,US);
A61F13/0226 (EP,US);
A61F13/025 (EP,US);
A61F13/0253 (EP,US);
A61F2013/4593 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1998/14] | A61F5/445 | Designated contracting states | DE, DK, ES, GB, IT [2000/17] |
Former [1998/14] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Ostomievorrichtung und Scheibe dafür mit einer Konturen aufweisenden Klebeschicht | [2002/11] | English: | Ostomy appliance and contoured adhesive wafer therefor | [1998/14] | French: | Dispositif d'ostomie et adhésive contouré associé | [1998/14] |
Former [1998/14] | Ostomievorrichtung und Scheibe dafür mit einer konturen aufweisenden Klebeschicht | Examination procedure | 12.10.1999 | Examination requested [1999/49] | 27.08.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.11.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 30.11.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
12.12.2003
19.12.2003
ADMISSIBLE Coloplast A/S Holtedam 1 DK-3050 Humlebaek / DK | [2005/27] |
Former [2004/07] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
12.12.2003
19.12.2003
ADMISSIBLE Coloplast A/S Holtedam 1 DK-3050 Humlebaek / DK Opponent's representative Beetz & Partner Patentanwälte Steinsdorfstrasse 10 80538 München / DE | 16.01.2004 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 23.07.2004 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 22.09.2005 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 22.09.2005 | Date of oral proceedings | 25.10.2005 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 25.10.2005 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 09.02.2006 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 13.03.2006 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.08.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.08.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 12.03.2003 | IT | 18.09.2005 | [2007/34] |
Former [2007/17] | ES | 12.03.2003 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3941133 (CHEN JAMES LING); | [AD]US4738257 (MEYER RALPH A [US], et al) [AD] 1 * abstract *; | [A]WO9415562 (COLOPLAST AS [DK], et al); | [A]EP0621042 (EUROMED I S [DK]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]GB2283916 (WELLAND MEDICAL LTD [GB]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]EP0686381 (DANSAC AS [DK]) [A] 1 * abstract * | by applicant | US3523534 | US3598150 | US4231369 | US4280498 | US4738257 | Opposition | US3055368 | US4867748 | WO9205755 | EP0806210 |