|
17.05.2006 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.05.2006 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.05.2006 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent |
Opposition |
2 |
|
29.04.2006 |
Filing of the translation of the amended claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.04.2006 |
French translation of claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
29.04.2006 |
German translation of the claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
09.02.2006 |
Communication of bibliographic data |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.02.2006 |
Communication to opponent concerning maintenance |
Opposition |
2 |
|
09.02.2006 |
Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
09.02.2006 |
Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.02.2006 |
Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.11.2005 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.11.2005 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.11.2005 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.11.2005 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.10.2005 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
9 |
|
25.10.2005 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
25.10.2005 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
6 |
|
25.10.2005 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.10.2005 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.10.2005 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.10.2005 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.10.2005 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.10.2005 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.10.2005 |
Text intended for grant |
Opposition |
8 |
|
22.09.2005 |
Information about the result of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.08.2005 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.08.2005 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.08.2005 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.08.2005 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.08.2005 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
22.08.2005 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
22.08.2005 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
24 |
|
20.08.2005 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
20.08.2005 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
20.08.2005 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
18.08.2005 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
18.08.2005 |
Claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
18.08.2005 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
18.08.2005 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
18.08.2005 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
18.08.2005 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
24 |
|
10.06.2005 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.06.2005 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.05.2005 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.05.2005 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.05.2005 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.01.2005 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.01.2005 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.01.2005 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.01.2005 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.01.2005 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.12.2004 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.12.2004 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.12.2004 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
2 |
|
28.12.2004 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
4 |
|
28.12.2004 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
28.12.2004 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
03.08.2004 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.07.2004 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
04.05.2004 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.05.2004 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.04.2004 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.01.2004 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.01.2004 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.12.2003 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.12.2003 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
17 |
|
12.12.2003 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
12.12.2003 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
12.12.2003 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
12.12.2003 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
23 |
|
12.12.2003 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
12.12.2003 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
12.12.2003 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
30.01.2003 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.12.2002 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.12.2002 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
21.12.2002 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
27.08.2002 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.08.2002 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
27.08.2002 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
13 |
|
02.07.1999 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.07.1999 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.09.1997 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.09.1997 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.09.1997 |
Description |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
18.09.1997 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.09.1997 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.09.1997 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
24 |
|
18.09.1997 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
6 |