Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0806210 | Global Dossier | 18.06.2003 | B1 | EP0806210 | 22.03.2000 | A3 | EP0806210 | 12.11.1997 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US64000896 | 30.04.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2201949 | 30.10.1997 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US64000896 | 30.04.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69722851T | 11.12.2003 | T2 | DE69722851D1 | 24.07.2003 | D1 | Priority number | Date | US64000896 | 30.04.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK0806210T | 13.10.2003 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US64000896 | 30.04.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2197305T | 01.01.2004 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US64000896 | 30.04.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5730736 | 24.03.1998 | A | Priority number | Date | US64000896 | 30.04.1996 | US71895596 | 26.09.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5811116 | 22.09.1998 | A | Priority number | Date | US64000896 | 30.04.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5834009 | 10.11.1998 | A | Priority number | Date | US64000896 | 30.04.1996 | US71895596 | 26.09.1996 | US96331697 | 03.11.1997 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0832626 | Global Dossier | 14.06.2006 | B2 | EP0832626 | 12.03.2003 | B1 | EP0832626 | 18.08.1999 | A3 | EP0832626 | 01.04.1998 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US71895596 | 26.09.1996 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2215175 | 26.03.1998 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US71895596 | 26.09.1996 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69719649T | 21.08.2003 | T2 | DE69719649D1 | 17.04.2003 | D1 | Priority number | Date | US71895596 | 26.09.1996 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE832626T | 06.04.2000 | T1 | Priority number | Date | US71895596 | 26.09.1996 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK0832626T | 14.07.2003 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US71895596 | 26.09.1996 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2194160T | 16.11.2003 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US71895596 | 26.09.1996 |