EP0832776 - Door and window channel seal [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.11.2002 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.09.2008 | Change - representative | published on 08.10.2008 [2008/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SCHLEGEL CORPORATION 1555 Jefferson Road Rochester New York 14623 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1998/14] | For all designated states SCHLEGEL CORPORATION 1555 Jefferson Road Rochester, New York 14623 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dover, Harold Philip 1412 Lincolnshire Drive Maryville, Tennessee 37803 / US | [1998/14] | Representative(s) | Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/41] | Carpmaels & Ransford One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | ||
Former [2002/40] | Carpmaels & Ransford 43 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | ||
Former [1998/14] | Carpmael, John William Maurice, et al CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43 Bloomsbury Square London, WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 97307457.8 | 24.09.1997 | [1998/14] | Priority number, date | US19960719988 | 25.09.1996 Original published format: US 719988 | [1998/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0832776 | Date: | 01.04.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0832776 | Date: | 16.01.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.01.1998 | Classification | IPC: | B60J10/00, B60J10/06 | [1998/14] | CPC: |
B60J10/79 (EP,KR,US);
B60J10/16 (EP,KR,US);
B60J10/21 (EP,KR,US);
B60J10/76 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1998/14] | Extension states | AL | 09.09.1998 | LT | 09.09.1998 | LV | 09.09.1998 | RO | 09.09.1998 | SI | 09.09.1998 | Title | German: | Laufkanaldichtung für Türen und Fenster | [1998/14] | English: | Door and window channel seal | [1998/14] | French: | Joint d'étanchéité de canal de guidage pour portes ou fenêtres | [1998/14] | Examination procedure | 09.09.1998 | Examination requested [1998/45] | 05.05.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.07.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.03.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 17.07.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.08.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 03.08.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.10.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.09.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 16.01.2002 | BE | 16.01.2002 | CH | 16.01.2002 | FI | 16.01.2002 | GR | 16.01.2002 | LI | 16.01.2002 | NL | 16.01.2002 | DK | 16.04.2002 | PT | 16.04.2002 | SE | 16.04.2002 | IE | 24.09.2002 | LU | 24.09.2002 | [2004/39] |
Former [2003/46] | AT | 16.01.2002 | |
BE | 16.01.2002 | ||
CH | 16.01.2002 | ||
FI | 16.01.2002 | ||
GR | 16.01.2002 | ||
LI | 16.01.2002 | ||
NL | 16.01.2002 | ||
DK | 16.04.2002 | ||
PT | 16.04.2002 | ||
SE | 16.04.2002 | ||
IE | 24.09.2002 | ||
Former [2003/42] | AT | 16.01.2002 | |
BE | 16.01.2002 | ||
CH | 16.01.2002 | ||
FI | 16.01.2002 | ||
GR | 16.01.2002 | ||
LI | 16.01.2002 | ||
NL | 16.01.2002 | ||
PT | 16.04.2002 | ||
SE | 16.04.2002 | ||
IE | 24.09.2002 | ||
Former [2003/19] | AT | 16.01.2002 | |
BE | 16.01.2002 | ||
CH | 16.01.2002 | ||
FI | 16.01.2002 | ||
GR | 16.01.2002 | ||
LI | 16.01.2002 | ||
NL | 16.01.2002 | ||
PT | 16.04.2002 | ||
SE | 16.04.2002 | ||
Former [2003/09] | AT | 16.01.2002 | |
BE | 16.01.2002 | ||
CH | 16.01.2002 | ||
FI | 16.01.2002 | ||
LI | 16.01.2002 | ||
NL | 16.01.2002 | ||
PT | 16.04.2002 | ||
SE | 16.04.2002 | ||
Former [2003/06] | BE | 16.01.2002 | |
CH | 16.01.2002 | ||
FI | 16.01.2002 | ||
LI | 16.01.2002 | ||
NL | 16.01.2002 | ||
PT | 16.04.2002 | ||
SE | 16.04.2002 | ||
Former [2003/01] | CH | 16.01.2002 | |
FI | 16.01.2002 | ||
LI | 16.01.2002 | ||
SE | 16.04.2002 | ||
Former [2002/49] | FI | 16.01.2002 | |
SE | 16.04.2002 | ||
Former [2002/37] | SE | 16.04.2002 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]FR2588035 (PEUGEOT [FR]) [X] 1,4,8-13 * page 6, line 26 - page 7, line 20; figure 5 * [A] 14,16; | [X]FR2635814 (HUTCHINSON [FR]) [X] 1,3 * figure 3 *; | [X]EP0403854 (FIAT AUTO SPA [IT]) [X] 1,3 * the whole document *; | [A]US5010689 (VAUGHAN ROBERT A [US]) [A] 1-17 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0540183 (SILENT CHANNEL PROD LTD [GB]) [A] 14-17* the whole document *; | [A]US5343609 (MCMANUS MICHAEL J [US]) [A] 1-17 * the whole document * |