EP0833370 - Ultraviolet detector [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.11.2004 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.11.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 05.01.2005 [2005/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HAMAMATSU PHOTONICS K.K. 1126-1 Ichino-cho Hamamatsu-shi, Shizuoka-ken 435-8558 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2004/03] | For all designated states Hamamatsu Photonics K.K. 1126-1, Ichino-cho, Hamamatsu-shi Shizuoka-ken 435-8558 / JP | ||
Former [1998/14] | For all designated states HAMAMATSU PHOTONICS K.K. 1126-1 Ichino-cho Hamamatsu-shi Shizuoka-ken 435 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Warashina, Hidenaga Hamamatsu Photonics K.K., 1126-1, Ichino-cho Hamamatsu-shi, Shizuoka-ken 435 / JP | 02 /
Shimazu, Yuji Hamamatsu Photonics K.K., 1126-1, Ichino-cho Hamamatsu-shi, Shizuoka-ken 435 / JP | [1998/14] | Representative(s) | Whitten, George Alan, et al R.G.C. Jenkins & Co 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1998/14] | Whitten, George Alan, et al R.G.C. Jenkins & Co., 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 97307613.6 | 26.09.1997 | [1998/14] | Priority number, date | JP19960255080 | 26.09.1996 Original published format: JP 25508096 | JP19960270776 | 14.10.1996 Original published format: JP 27077696 | [1998/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0833370 | Date: | 01.04.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/14] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0833370 | Date: | 29.03.2000 | [2000/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0833370 | Date: | 14.01.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.02.2000 | Classification | IPC: | H01J47/02, H01J47/08 | [2000/13] | CPC: |
H01J47/02 (EP,US);
G01J1/429 (KR);
G01J1/44 (KR);
G01J2001/4453 (KR)
|
Former IPC [1998/14] | H01J47/02 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2000/49] |
Former [1998/14] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Ultraviolet Detektor | [1998/14] | English: | Ultraviolet detector | [1998/14] | French: | Détecteur ultraviolet | [1998/14] | Examination procedure | 30.06.2000 | Examination requested [2000/35] | 12.12.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.04.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.05.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.09.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 23.09.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.10.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.09.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4581536 (GROPPETTI CLAUDIO C [US], et al) [Y] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [Y]US4409485 (MORRIS HAYDEN [US], et al) [Y] 1-10 * column A; figure . *; | [A]DE1564073 (HONEYWELL INC) [A] 1,2 * page 11, line 1 - page 15, line L; figures 4-8 * |