EP0838242 - Thermally responsive frangible bulb [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.04.2003 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 20.08.2008 [2008/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TYCO FIRE PRODUCTS MANUFACTURING LIMITED Stockport Trading Estate, Yew Street Stockport, SK4 2JW / GB | [2000/29] |
Former [1998/18] | For all designated states Grinnell Manufacturing (UK) Limited Stockport Trading Estate, Yew Street Stockport, SK4 2JW / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Pepi, Jerome Stefansson 10 Kathy Drive Foxboro, Massachusetts 02035 / US | 02 /
Nettleship, Stephen James 8 Birchwood Drive, Lower Peover Knutsford, Cheshire, WA16 9QJ / GB | 03 /
Daly, Brian Ernest 18 The Heys, Reddish, Stockport Cheshire, SK5 6XS / GB | [1998/18] | Representative(s) | Ajello, Michael John, et al Harrison Goddard Foote 4th Floor, Merchant Exchange 17-19 Whitworth Street West Manchester M1 5WG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/34] | Ajello, Michael John, et al Harrison Goddard Foote Orlando House 11C Compstall Road Marple Bridge Stockport SK6 5HH / GB | ||
Former [2003/13] | Ajello, Michael John, et al Harrison, Goddard, Foote, 11c Compstall Road, Marple Bridge Stockport SK6 5HH / GB | ||
Former [1998/33] | Ajello, Michael John Urquhart-Dykes & Lord, Northern Assurance Buildings, Albert Square Manchester M2 4DN / GB | ||
Former [1998/18] | Ajello, Michael John 207 Moss Lane Bramhall Stockport Cheshire SK7 1BA / GB | Application number, filing date | 97307891.8 | 02.10.1997 | [1998/18] | Priority number, date | GB19960020598 | 03.10.1996 Original published format: GB 9620598 | [1998/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0838242 | Date: | 29.04.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/18] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0838242 | Date: | 04.08.1999 | [1999/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0838242 | Date: | 05.06.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.06.1999 | Classification | IPC: | A62C37/14 | [1998/18] | CPC: |
A62C37/14 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, DK, ES, GB, SE [2000/16] |
Former [2000/15] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, LI | ||
Former [1998/18] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Wärmeempfindliche zerbrechbare Ampulle | [1998/18] | English: | Thermally responsive frangible bulb | [1998/18] | French: | Ampoule frangible thermosensible | [1998/18] | Examination procedure | 04.02.2000 | Examination requested [2000/14] | 16.08.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 10.12.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.03.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 05.03.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.03.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.10.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | DK | 05.09.2002 | SE | 05.09.2002 | DE | 06.09.2002 | ES | 20.12.2002 | [2004/04] |
Former [2003/46] | DK | 05.09.2002 | |
SE | 05.09.2002 | ||
DE | 06.09.2002 | ||
Former [2003/31] | SE | 05.09.2002 | |
DE | 06.09.2002 | ||
Former [2002/49] | SE | 05.09.2002 | Documents cited: | Search | [AP]WO9726945 (NORBULB SPRINKLER ELEMENTE GMB [DE], et al) [AP] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]WO8806046 (MOHLER JOHANN GEORG [CH]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]US5392993 (FISCHER MICHAEL [US]) [A] 7 * column 5, line 22 - column 9, line 44; figure - * | [AD] - H.H.FAHRENKROG ET AL, "Untersuchung der Einflußgrößen beim Bersten von Sprinklerampullen", SPRECHSAAL, (1988), vol. 121, no. 9, pages 781 - 787, XP002105149 [AD] 1 | by applicant | US1639911 | US4121665 | US4167974 | USRE16132E | US4796710 | US4993496 |