EP0840346 - Cathode mounting for ion source with indirectly heated cathode [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.10.2002 Database last updated on 20.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.10.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.12.2002 [2002/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Axcelis Technologies, Inc. 55 Cherry Hill Drive Beverly, MA 01915-1053 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2000/33] | For all designated states Axcelis Technologies, Inc. 55 Cherry Hill Drive Beverly, MA 01915 / US | ||
Former [1998/19] | For all designated states EATON CORPORATION Eaton Center, 1111 Superior Avenue Cleveland, Ohio 44114-2584 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Horsky, Thomas Neil 816 Depot Road Boxborough, Massachusetts 01719-1119 / US | 02 /
Reynolds, William Edward 210 Perkins Row Topsfied, Massachusetts 01983-1509 / US | 03 /
Cloutier, Richard Maurice 185 Willow Street Salisbury, Massachusetts 01952-1312 / US | [1998/19] | Representative(s) | Burke, Steven David, et al R.G.C. Jenkins & Co 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1998/19] | Burke, Steven David, et al R.G.C. Jenkins & Co. 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 97308481.7 | 23.10.1997 | [1998/19] | Priority number, date | US19960740478 | 30.10.1996 Original published format: US 740478 | [1998/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0840346 | Date: | 06.05.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0840346 | Date: | 12.12.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.02.1998 | Classification | IPC: | H01J27/14, H01J37/08, H01J37/317, H01J1/20 | [1998/19] | CPC: |
H01J27/08 (EP,US);
H01L21/265 (KR);
H01J2237/08 (EP,US);
H01J2237/31701 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL [1999/03] |
Former [1998/19] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Kathodenbefestigung für eine Ionenquelle mit indirekt geheizter Kathode | [1998/19] | English: | Cathode mounting for ion source with indirectly heated cathode | [1998/19] | French: | Support de cathode pour source d'ions avec cathode à chauffage indirect | [1998/19] | Examination procedure | 01.04.1998 | Examination requested [1998/23] | 28.12.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.04.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.04.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 08.06.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.09.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 12.09.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.09.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.10.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]US5497006 (SFERLAZZO PIERO [US], et al) [DA] 1,8,10 * column 5, line 25 - column 6, line 24; figure 5 *; | [DA]US5026997 (BENVENISTE VICTOR M [US]) [DA] 1,8,10 * abstract *; | [DA]US5420415 (TRUEIRA FRANK R [US]) [DA] 1,8,10 * abstract *; | [DA]US4672210 (ARMSTRONG ALLEN E [US], et al) [DA] 1 * abstract * |