EP0851467 - Method and system for monocrystalline epitaxial deposition [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.08.2003 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.10.2003 [2003/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MEMC Electronic Materials, Inc. 501 Pearl Drive, P.O. Box 8 St. Peters Missouri 63376 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1998/27] | For all designated states MEMC Electronic Materials, Inc. 501 Pearl Drive P.O. Box 8 St. Peters, Missouri 63376 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hellwig, Lance G. 8908 Darnell Place St. Louis, Missouri 63136 / US | [1998/27] | Representative(s) | Smaggasgale, Gillian Helen, et al WP Thompson 138 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/33] | Smaggasgale, Gillian Helen, et al W.P. Thompson & Co, Celcon House, 289-293 High Holborn London WC1V 7HU / GB | ||
Former [1998/27] | Eyles, Christopher Thomas W.P. THOMPSON & CO. Celcon House 289-293 High Holborn London WC1V 7HU / GB | Application number, filing date | 97308596.2 | 28.10.1997 | [1998/27] | Priority number, date | US19960774519 | 30.12.1996 Original published format: US 774519 | [1998/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0851467 | Date: | 01.07.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/27] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0851467 | Date: | 29.09.1999 | [1999/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.08.1999 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/205, C23C16/44, C30B15/14 | [1999/39] | CPC: |
C23C16/45504 (EP,US);
C23C16/44 (KR);
C23C16/4412 (EP,US);
C23C16/455 (EP,US);
C30B25/14 (EP,US);
H01L21/02381 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [1998/27] | H01L21/205, C23C16/44 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2000/24] |
Former [1998/27] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Methode und System für eine monokristalline epitaxiale Abscheidung | [1998/27] | English: | Method and system for monocrystalline epitaxial deposition | [1998/27] | French: | Méthode et système pour le dépôt épitaxial monocristallin | [1998/27] | Examination procedure | 01.02.2000 | Examination requested [2000/14] | 30.03.2000 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 21.07.2000 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | 20.09.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.01.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/40] | 05.05.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2003/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.10.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 09.05.2000 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 09.05.2000 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 09.05.2000 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 09.05.2000 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 09.05.2000 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 09.05.2000 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 09.05.2000 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 09.05.2000 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 09.05.2000 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 09.05.2000 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 09.05.2000 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 09.05.2000 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 09.05.2000 | SE   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [E]EP0823491 (CONCEPT SYSTEMS DESIGN INC [US]) [E] 8 * column 4, line 55 - column 7, line 29 *; | [A]US5444217 (MOORE GARY M [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * abstract * * column 11, line 49 - line 56 * * column 20, line 44 - line 68 *; | [A]US4986838 (JOHNSGARD MARK W [US]) [A] 4,5,8,10 * column 1, line 10 - column 2, line 35 *; | [A]JPS59232990 ; | JPS59232990 [ ] (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [ ] * column 7 - column 8 *; | [A]JPH05234902 ; | JPH05234902 [ ] (FUJITSU LTD) [ ] * column 4 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19850511), vol. 009, no. 108, Database accession no. (C - 280), & JP59232990 A 19841227 (MATSUSHITA DENKI SANGYO KK) [A] 1,8 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19931215), vol. 017, no. 683, Database accession no. (E - 1477), & JP05234902 A 19930910 (FUJITSU LTD) [A] 1,8 * abstract * |