EP0840043 - Non-contacting mechanical end face seal [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.03.2004 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.04.2004 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): DK | published on 02.06.2004 [2004/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states JOHN CRANE INC. 6400 West Oakton Street Morton Grove, IL 60053 / US | [1998/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Klostermann, Gregory E. 415 East Hackberry Arlington Heights Illinois 60004 / US | 02 /
Lai, Wei-Tang 1195W Sturbridge Hoffman States II, 60195 / US | 03 /
Wasser, James R. 4850 Kings Way West Gurnee II, 60031 / US | [1998/19] | Representative(s) | Watts, Peter Graham Anthony Cundy & Co. 39/41 South Drive Sutton Coldfield West Midlands B75 7TE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/51] | Watts, Peter Graham Anthony Cundy & Co., 1 Olton Bridge, 245 Warwick Road Solihull, West Midlands B92 7AH / GB | ||
Former [1999/41] | Flynn, Michael Joseph, et al William Jones, Willow Lane House, Willow Lane Norwich NR2 1EU / GB | ||
Former [1998/19] | Jones, William, et al Willow Lane House Willow Lane Norwich NR2 1EU / GB | Application number, filing date | 97308634.1 | 29.10.1997 | [1998/19] | Priority number, date | US19960743012 | 01.11.1996 Original published format: US 743012 | US19970889252 | 10.07.1997 Original published format: US 889252 | [1998/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0840043 | Date: | 06.05.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/19] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0840043 | Date: | 19.05.1999 | [1999/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0840043 | Date: | 14.05.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.04.1999 | Classification | IPC: | F16J15/34 | [1998/19] | CPC: |
F16J15/3468 (EP,US);
F16J15/3464 (KR);
F16J15/3452 (KR);
F16J15/3472 (EP,US);
F16J15/3484 (EP,US);
Y10S277/908 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [2000/04] |
Former [1998/19] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Berührungslose Gleitringdichtung | [1998/19] | English: | Non-contacting mechanical end face seal | [1998/19] | French: | Garniture mécanique d'étanchéité sans contact. | [1998/19] | Examination procedure | 18.11.1999 | Examination requested [2000/03] | 11.11.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.03.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 07.03.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.02.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.10.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 14.05.2003 | CH | 14.05.2003 | LI | 14.05.2003 | DK | 14.08.2003 | SE | 14.08.2003 | [2004/23] |
Former [2004/03] | AT | 14.05.2003 | |
CH | 14.05.2003 | ||
LI | 14.05.2003 | ||
SE | 14.08.2003 | ||
Former [2004/01] | CH | 14.05.2003 | |
LI | 14.05.2003 | ||
SE | 14.08.2003 | ||
Former [2003/50] | SE | 14.08.2003 | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]US4212475 (SEDY JOSEF [US]) [DA] 1 * column 2, lines 38-55 - column 4, lines 25-43; figures 1,2 *; | [A]US5121931 (MATSUSHITA MITSUYOSHI [JP], et al) [A] 1 * column 2, line 22 - line 35; figure 5 *; | [A]WO9502137 (REVOLVE TECHNOLOGIES INC [CA]) [A] 1 * page 5, lines 1-9 * * page 10, line 1 - page 11, line 11; figures 1,4,5 *; | [A] - AMRAT PARMAR, "DESIGNING OUT THERMAL DISTORTION EXTENDS MECHANICAL FACE SEAL LIFE", DESIGN ENGINEERING, (198908), page 28, 30, 33, 36, XP000030336 [A] 1 * page 30, column 2 - page 33, column 1; figures 2,4 * | [A] - H.W. GÜNTHER, "Auslegungsmodell für stationäre Gleitringsdichtungen unter Berücksichtigung praxisgerechter Belastungen", KONSTRUKTION, Berlin, (1991), vol. 43, no. 5, pages 161 - 165, XP000195113 [A] 1 * paragraph [0004] * | by applicant | US3499653 | US3804424 | US4212475 | US4290611 | US4407512 | US5375853 | US5681047 |