EP0867938 - Semiconductor device comprising electrode pads and leads [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.08.2014 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.08.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.10.2014 [2014/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Oki Electric Industry Co., Ltd. 7-12, Toranomon 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1998/40] | For all designated states Oki Electric Industry Co., Ltd. 7-12, Toranomon 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Uchida, Yasufumi c/o Oki Electric Industry Co., Ltd. 7-12, Toranomon 1-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [1998/40] | Representative(s) | Read, Matthew Charles, et al Venner Shipley LLP 200 Aldersgate London EC1A 4HD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1998/40] | Read, Matthew Charles, et al Venner Shipley & Co. 20 Little Britain London EC1A 7DH / GB | Application number, filing date | 97308718.2 | 30.10.1997 | [1998/40] | Priority number, date | JP19970076780 | 28.03.1997 Original published format: JP 7678097 | [1998/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0867938 | Date: | 30.09.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/40] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0867938 | Date: | 10.03.1999 | [1999/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.01.1999 | Classification | IPC: | H01L23/495 | [1998/40] | CPC: |
H01L24/48 (EP,US);
H01L21/60 (KR);
H01L23/4951 (EP,US);
H01L24/03 (EP,US);
H01L24/05 (EP,US);
H01L24/06 (EP,US);
H01L24/49 (EP,US);
H01L24/78 (EP,US);
H01L24/85 (EP,US);
H01L2224/02166 (EP,US);
H01L2224/023 (EP);
H01L2224/0401 (EP,US);
H01L2224/04042 (EP,US);
H01L2224/05554 (EP,US);
H01L2224/05556 (EP,US);
H01L2224/05599 (EP,US);
H01L2224/45124 (EP,US);
H01L2224/48091 (EP,US);
H01L2224/48247 (EP,US);
H01L2224/4826 (EP,US);
H01L2224/48465 (EP,US);
H01L2224/48699 (EP,US);
H01L2224/4899 (EP,US);
H01L2224/49171 (EP,US);
H01L2224/49175 (EP,US);
H01L2224/78 (EP,US);
H01L2924/00014 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01005 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01006 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01013 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01015 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01019 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01021 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01029 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01074 (EP,US);
H01L2924/014 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
H01L2224/023, H01L2924/0001 (EP);
H01L2224/45124, H01L2924/00 (US,EP);
H01L2224/48091, H01L2924/00014 (US,EP);
H01L2224/4826, H01L2224/48465, H01L2924/00 (EP,US);
H01L2224/4826, H01L2224/49171, H01L2924/00 (EP,US);
H01L2224/4826, H01L2224/49175, H01L2924/00 (EP,US);
H01L2224/48465, H01L2224/48091, H01L2924/00 (US,EP);
H01L2224/48465, H01L2224/48247, H01L2924/00 (EP,US);
H01L2224/48465, H01L2224/48247, H01L2924/00012 (US,EP);
H01L2224/48465, H01L2224/4826, H01L2924/00 (US,EP);
H01L2224/48699, H01L2924/00 (US,EP);
H01L2224/49171, H01L2224/48247, H01L2924/00 (US,EP);
H01L2224/49171, H01L2224/48465, H01L2924/00 (US,EP);
H01L2224/49175, H01L2224/48247, H01L2924/00 (US,EP);
H01L2224/49175, H01L2224/48465, H01L2924/00 (US,EP);
H01L2924/00014, H01L2224/05556 (EP,US);
H01L2924/00014, H01L2224/05599, H01L2924/00 (US,EP);
H01L2924/00014, H01L2224/45099 (EP,US);
H01L2924/00014, H01L2224/45099, H01L2924/00 (US,EP);
H01L2924/00014, H01L2224/85399 (US,EP); | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1999/50] |
Former [1999/47] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, LI | ||
Former [1998/40] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Halbleiteranordnung mit Elektrodenflächen und Leiter | [1998/40] | English: | Semiconductor device comprising electrode pads and leads | [1998/40] | French: | Dispositif semiconducteur comprenant des plages d'électrodes et des conducteurs | [1998/40] | Examination procedure | 30.08.1999 | Examination requested [1999/43] | 11.09.1999 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 20.01.2000 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, LI, LU, MC, PT, SE | 13.11.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.03.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.07.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.10.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.05.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/40] | 26.05.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2014/40] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.11.2003 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.10.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 17.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 18.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 18.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 17.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 20.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 20.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 19.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 20.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 19.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 16 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 08.11.1999 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 08.11.1999 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 08.11.1999 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 08.11.1999 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 08.11.1999 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 08.11.1999 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 08.11.1999 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 08.11.1999 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 08.11.1999 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 08.11.1999 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 08.11.1999 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 08.11.1999 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2013 | 17   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US5252854 (ARITA JUNICHI [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,4,14 * column 3, line 65 - column 4, line 54; figures 1,2,6,7B * * column 7, line 46 - column 8, line 29 * [A] 11-13; | [XA]JPH06283659 ; | [A]JPH05114622 ; | [XA]US5319241 (LIM THIAM B [SG]) [X] 1,2,4,14 * column 4, line 11 - column 5, line 28; figures 3,4 * [A] 11-13 | [XA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19950228), vol. 095, no. 001, & JP06283659 A 19941007 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [X] 1,2,14 * abstract * [A] 11-13 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19930830), vol. 017, no. 476, Database accession no. (E - 1424), & JP05114622 A 19930507 (HITACHI LTD;OTHERS: 01) [A] 1,11-14 * the whole document * | by applicant | US5252854 | US5319241 | JPH06286659 |