EP0841570 - Automatic detection of shorted loudspeakers in automotive audio systems [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.03.2007 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.11.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 31.12.2008 [2009/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FORD MOTOR COMPANY Suite 911, Parklane Towers East, One Parklane Boulevard Dearborn, MI 48126 / US | [2006/13] |
Former [1998/20] | For all designated states Ford Motor Company Suite 911, Parklane Towers East, One Parklane Boulevard Dearborn, MI 48126 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Whitecar, John Elliot 41052 Greenbrook Lane 6/95 Plymouth, Michigan 48170 / US | 02 /
Krochmal, Andrew Cyril 489, Blunk Plymouth, Michigan 48170 / US | [1998/20] | Representative(s) | Messulam, Alec Moses Harrison IP Limited 3 Ebor House London Ebor Business Park Millfield Lane Nether Poppleton York YO26 6QY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1998/20] | Messulam, Alec Moses A. Messulam & Co. 24 Broadway Leigh-on-Sea Essex SS9 1BN / GB | Application number, filing date | 97308755.4 | 31.10.1997 | [1998/20] | Priority number, date | US19960745768 | 08.11.1996 Original published format: US 745768 | [1998/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0841570 | Date: | 13.05.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/20] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0841570 | Date: | 07.07.1999 | [1999/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0841570 | Date: | 29.03.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.05.1999 | Classification | IPC: | G01R31/02 | [1998/20] | CPC: |
G01R31/007 (EP,US);
G01R31/52 (EP,US);
G01R31/67 (EP,US);
H04R29/001 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2000/11] |
Former [1998/20] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Automatische Erkennung von kurzgeschlossenen Lautsprechern in Kraftfahrzeugaudiosystemen | [1998/20] | English: | Automatic detection of shorted loudspeakers in automotive audio systems | [1998/20] | French: | Détection automatique des haut-parleurs court-circuités dans des systèmes audio pour automobiles | [1998/20] | Examination procedure | 24.12.1999 | Examination requested [2000/09] | 10.05.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.09.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.08.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.12.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 15.12.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.01.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.09.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.08.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 07.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 29.03.2006 | [2009/01] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0607693 (FORD MOTOR CO [US]) [A] 1-5,7-9 * column 2, line 20 - column 4, line 40 * * column 5, line 40 - column 6, line 56 * * figures 1,3 *; | [A]EP0479456 (FORD MOTOR CO [GB], et al) [A] 1,2,5,8 * column 2, line 3 - line 12 * * column 3, line 22 - column 5, line 30 * * figures 2,3 *; | [A]EP0434265 (FORD MOTOR CO [GB], et al) [A] 1,5,7-9 * column 2, line 5 - line 51 * * column 3, line 8 - column 4, line 39 * * figures 1,2 *; | [A]US5255324 (BREWER JAMES E [US], et al) [A] 1,5,7-9 * column 3, line 12 - line 30 * * column 3, line 52 - column 4, line 37 * * figure 1 * |