EP0843454 - Extending internet calls to a telephone call center [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 04.02.2000 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.02.2000 | Withdrawal of application | published on 22.03.2000 [2000/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC. 600 Mountain Avenue Murray Hill, NJ 07974-0636 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1998/21] | For all designated states LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC. 600 Mountain Avenue Murray Hill, New Jersey 07974-0636 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Coffman, James E. 4560 Martin Drive Boulder, Colorado 80303 / US | 02 /
Haserodt, Kurt H. 4860 W. 102nd Pl. Westminster, Colorado 80030 / US | [1998/21] | Representative(s) | Johnston, Kenneth Graham, et al Lucent Technologies EUR-IP UK Ltd Unit 18, Core 3 Workzone Innova Business Park Electric Avenue Enfield, EN3 7XB / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1998/21] | Johnston, Kenneth Graham, et al Lucent Technologies (UK) Ltd, 5 Mornington Road Woodford Green Essex, IG8 OTU / GB | Application number, filing date | 97308848.7 | 04.11.1997 | [1998/21] | Priority number, date | US19960749298 | 14.11.1996 Original published format: US 749298 | [1998/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0843454 | Date: | 20.05.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/21] | Classification | IPC: | H04M3/50, H04M7/12, H04L29/06 | [1998/21] | CPC: |
H04M7/003 (EP,US);
H04L12/6418 (EP,US);
H04L9/40 (EP,US);
H04M3/5191 (EP,US);
H04Q11/0457 (EP,US);
H04L2012/6427 (EP,US);
H04L2012/6472 (EP,US);
H04L2012/6475 (EP,US);
H04L2012/6486 (EP,US);
H04L67/02 (EP);
H04M2207/203 (EP,US);
H04M2242/22 (EP,US);
H04M3/42042 (EP,US);
H04M3/42178 (EP,US);
H04Q2213/13034 (EP,US);
H04Q2213/1307 (EP,US);
H04Q2213/13072 (EP,US);
H04Q2213/13091 (EP,US);
H04Q2213/13093 (EP,US);
H04Q2213/13175 (EP,US);
H04Q2213/13196 (EP,US);
H04Q2213/13204 (EP,US);
H04Q2213/13209 (EP,US);
H04Q2213/13389 (EP,US);
H04Q3/72 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1998/21] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Internetanrufherstellung zu einer Fernsprechanrufzentrale | [1998/21] | English: | Extending internet calls to a telephone call center | [1998/21] | French: | Etablissement d'appels Internet vers un centre d'appel téléphonique | [1998/21] | Examination procedure | 13.12.1999 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2000/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |