EP0844432 - Method and apparatus for producing liquid mixtures of oxygen and nitrogen [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.07.2007 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.07.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 15.08.2007 [2007/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE BOC GROUP, INC. 575 Mountain Avenue, Murray Hill New Providence, NJ 07974-2082 / US | [2006/36] |
Former [1998/22] | For all designated states THE BOC GROUP, INC. 575 Mountain Avenue Murray Hill, New Providence, New Jersey 07974-2082 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lee, Ron Clark 9 Fawn Run Bloomsbury, New Jersey 08804 / US | [1998/22] | Representative(s) | Wickham, Michael, et al C/o Patent and Trademark Department The BOC Group plc Chertsey Road Windlesham Surrey GU20 6HJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1998/22] | Wickham, Michael, et al c/o Patent and Trademark Department The BOC Group plc Chertsey Road Windlesham Surrey GU20 6HJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 97308982.4 | 07.11.1997 | [1998/22] | Priority number, date | US19960752131 | 20.11.1996 Original published format: US 752131 | [1998/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0844432 | Date: | 27.05.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/22] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0844432 | Date: | 09.06.1999 | [1999/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0844432 | Date: | 06.09.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.04.1999 | Classification | IPC: | F17C9/00 | [1998/22] | CPC: |
F17C9/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [2000/08] |
Former [1998/22] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Herstellung von Sauerstoff/Stickstoff-Flüssigmischungen | [1998/22] | English: | Method and apparatus for producing liquid mixtures of oxygen and nitrogen | [1998/22] | French: | Procédé et dispositif de production de mélanges liquides d'oxygène et d'azote | [1998/22] | Examination procedure | 02.12.1999 | Examination requested [2000/04] | 10.12.1999 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 15.05.2000 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, CH, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, LI, LU, MC, PT | 28.04.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.07.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 19.07.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.06.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.10.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 29.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 25.01.2000 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 25.01.2000 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 25.01.2000 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 25.01.2000 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 25.01.2000 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 25.01.2000 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 25.01.2000 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 25.01.2000 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 25.01.2000 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 25.01.2000 | PT   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4718772 (DELACOUR PIERRE [FR], et al) [A] 1 * column W *; | [A]EP0463265 (AIR LIQUIDE [FR], et al) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]US3717006 (KIMMEL C, et al) [A] 1 * column W * |