EP0917333 - Information gathering system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.07.1999 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.07.1999 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.09.1999 [1999/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BRITISH TELECOMMUNICATIONS public limited company 81 Newgate Street London EC1A 7AJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/20] | For all designated states BRITISH TELECOMMUNICATIONS public limited company 81 Newgate Street London EC1A 7AJ / GB | Representative(s) | Lidbetter, Timothy Guy Edwin, et al BT Intellectual Property Department Ground Floor BT Faraday Building 1 Knightrider Street London EC4V 5BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/20] | Lidbetter, Timothy Guy Edwin, et al BT Group Legal Services, Intellectual Property Department, 8th Floor, Holborn Centre, 120 Holborn London EC1N 2TE / GB | Application number, filing date | 97309148.1 | 13.11.1997 | [1999/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0917333 | Date: | 19.05.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.09.1998 | Classification | IPC: | H04M3/42 | [1999/20] | CPC: |
H04M3/42 (EP,US);
H04M3/4228 (EP,US);
H04M3/42323 (EP,US);
H04M7/12 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1999/20] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Informations-Ansammelsystem | [1999/20] | English: | Information gathering system | [1999/20] | French: | Système pour recueillir des informations | [1999/20] | Examination procedure | 14.03.1999 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1999/36] | 15.04.1999 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: A.91(5) [1999/36] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0738093 (TELIA AB [SE]) [X] 1-15 * figure 1 * * column 3, line 49 - column 5, line 43 *; | [A]EP0661897 (AT & T CORP [US]) [A] 1-12,14,15 * figures 1,3,4 * * column 3, line 3 - column 8, line 34 * * column 10, line 19 - column 12, line 22 * |