EP0843251 - Data input/output, recording and reproduction [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.01.2010 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.01.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.03.2010 [2010/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Corporation 6-7-35 Kitashinagawa Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2009/13] | For all designated states Sony Corporation 6-7-35 Kitashinagawa Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141 / JP | ||
Former [1998/21] | For all designated states SONY CORPORATION 6-7-35 Kitashinagawa Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Iwasaki, Yasuo, c/o Int. Prop. Dpt Sony Corp., 6-7-35, Kitashinagawa Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo 141 / JP | [1998/21] | Representative(s) | Cotter, Ivan John, et al D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1998/21] | Cotter, Ivan John, et al D. YOUNG & CO. 21 New Fetter Lane London EC4A 1DA / GB | Application number, filing date | 97309163.0 | 13.11.1997 | [1998/21] | Priority number, date | JP19960308407 | 19.11.1996 Original published format: JP 30840796 | [1998/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0843251 | Date: | 20.05.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/21] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0843251 | Date: | 17.07.2002 | [2002/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0843251 | Date: | 25.03.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.06.2002 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/06 | [1998/21] | CPC: |
G06F3/06 (KR);
G11B20/10 (EP,US);
G11B20/10527 (KR);
H04N21/21 (EP,KR,US);
H04N21/23 (EP,KR,US);
G11B2220/2516 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2003/15] |
Former [1998/21] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Dateneingang/ausgang, -aufzeichnung und -wiedergabe | [1998/21] | English: | Data input/output, recording and reproduction | [1998/21] | French: | Entrée/sortie de données, enregistrement et reproduction | [1998/21] | Examination procedure | 27.12.2002 | Examination requested [2003/10] | 15.03.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.06.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.09.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.12.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.09.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.01.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.10.2008 | Date of oral proceedings | 31.10.2008 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 05.11.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.02.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 04.02.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.12.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 14.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 14.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 15.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0727750 (TOSHIBA KK [JP]) [A] 1-14 * column 1, line 15 - column 10, line 46 * * column 14, line 23 - column 25, line 46; figures 5-29; claim - *; | [A]US5574662 (WINDREM KEVIN D [US], et al) [A] 1-14 * column W *; | [A]US5497244 (CHARGIN JR JAMES E [US], et al) [A] 1-14 * column W * |