EP0844759 - Artificial fading for frequency offset mitigation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.11.2005 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.10.2008 | Change - representative | published on 12.11.2008 [2008/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC. 600 Mountain Avenue Murray Hill, NJ 07974-0636 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1998/22] | For all designated states LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC. 600 Mountain Avenue Murray Hill, New Jersey 07974-0636 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Golden, Glenn David 868 Brook Road Boulder, Colorado 80302 / US | [1998/22] | Representative(s) | Sarup, David Alexander, et al Alcatel-Lucent Telecom Ltd Patent Business c/o Nokia 125 Finsbury Pavement London EC2A 1NQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/46] | Sarup, David Alexander, et al Alcatel-Lucent Telecom Limited Unit 18, Core 3, Workzone Innova Business Park Electric Avenue Enfield EN3 7XU / GB | ||
Former [2005/25] | Sarup, David Alexander, et al Lucent Technologie NS UK Limited 5 Mornington Road Woodford Green, Essex IG8 0TU / GB | ||
Former [1998/22] | Buckley, Christopher Simon Thirsk, et al Lucent Technologies (UK) Ltd, 5 Mornington Road Woodford Green, Essex IG8 0TU / GB | Application number, filing date | 97309248.9 | 18.11.1997 | [1998/22] | Priority number, date | US19960756293 | 25.11.1996 Original published format: US 756293 | [1998/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0844759 | Date: | 27.05.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0844759 | Date: | 12.01.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.03.1998 | Classification | IPC: | H04L1/06 | [1998/22] | CPC: |
H04L1/06 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1999/06] |
Former [1998/22] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Künstlisches Fading zur Abschwächung einer Frequenzverschiebung | [1998/22] | English: | Artificial fading for frequency offset mitigation | [1998/22] | French: | Evanouissement artificiel pour la réduction d'une fréquence de décalage | [1998/22] | Examination procedure | 09.11.1998 | Examination requested [1999/01] | 15.09.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.12.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.01.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.05.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.07.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.10.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 27.10.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.10.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 01.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 15.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0735702 (THOMSON CSF [FR]) [A] 1-12 * page 2, line 53 - page 3, line 6 *; | [A] - BELLINI ET AL., "Digital frequency estimation in burst mode QPSK transmission", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON COMMUNICATIONS, (199007), vol. 38, no. 7, pages 959 - 961, XP002057110 [A] 1,4 * page 959, column L, paragraph 1 * * page 959, column L, paragraph 5 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/26.57493 |