EP0884258 - Slant correcting mechanism for printer apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.01.2003 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.01.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 19.02.2003 [2003/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2002/09] | For all designated states FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | ||
Former [1998/51] | For all designated states FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Umeno, Hideyuki c/o Fujitsu Limited, 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome Nakahara-ku, Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211 / JP | [1998/51] | Representative(s) | Stebbing, Timothy Charles, et al Haseltine Lake LLP Lincoln House, 5th Floor 300 High Holborn London WC1V 7JH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1998/51] | Stebbing, Timothy Charles, et al Haseltine Lake & Co., Imperial House, 15-19 Kingsway London WC2B 6UD / GB | Application number, filing date | 97309429.5 | 21.11.1997 | [1998/51] | Priority number, date | JP19970156199 | 13.06.1997 Original published format: JP 15619997 | [1998/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0884258 | Date: | 16.12.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/51] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0884258 | Date: | 12.05.1999 | [1999/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0884258 | Date: | 27.02.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.03.1999 | Classification | IPC: | B65H9/10, B65H9/06, B41J13/26 | [1999/19] | CPC: |
B41J13/0018 (EP,US);
B41J13/02 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1998/51] | B65H9/10, B65H9/06 | Designated contracting states | ES, FR, GB [2000/03] |
Former [1998/51] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Schräglaufkorrektionsmechanismus in Druckern | [1998/51] | English: | Slant correcting mechanism for printer apparatus | [1998/51] | French: | Dispositif de correction du désalignement dans des appareils d'impression | [1998/51] | Examination procedure | 19.05.1999 | Examination requested [1999/28] | 14.02.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 17.04.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.07.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 09.07.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.11.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]JPH0422657 ; | [A]JPH0494351 ; | [A]WO9601742 (DIGITAL EQUIPMENT BCFI AB [SE], et al) [A] 1 * the whole document * | [DA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19920506), vol. 016, no. 184, Database accession no. (M - 1243), & JP04022657 A 19920127 (FUJITSU LTD) [DA] 1 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19920716), vol. 016, no. 328, Database accession no. (M - 1281), & JP04094351 A 19920326 (MAX CO LTD) [A] 1 * abstract * |