EP0895440 - Electrical PTC heating device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.05.2003 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.05.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.07.2003 [2003/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states A.T.C.T. ADVANCED THERMAL CHIPS TECHNOLOGIES LTD. P.O. Box 12012 Ashdod 77609 / IL | [2001/19] |
Former [1999/05] | For all designated states Body Heat Ltd P.O. Box 3 Ariel 44837 / IL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Golan, Gad 8 Hovhit Street Hod Hasharon 45352 / IL | 02 /
Galperin, Yuly 4/8 Froog Street Holon 58292 / IL | [1999/05] | Representative(s) | Morton, Colin David, et al Nash Matthews 90-92 Regent Street Cambridge CB2 1DP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/05] | Morton, Colin David, et al Keith W Nash & Co. Pearl Assurance House 90-92 Regent Street Cambridge CB2 1DP / GB | Application number, filing date | 97309478.2 | 25.11.1997 | [1999/05] | Priority number, date | IL19970121448 | 01.08.1997 Original published format: IL 12144897 | [1999/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0895440 | Date: | 03.02.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/05] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0895440 | Date: | 19.05.1999 | [1999/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.04.1999 | Classification | IPC: | H05B3/14, H05B3/50 | [1999/05] | CPC: |
H05B3/14 (EP,US);
H05B3/50 (EP,US);
H05B2203/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IE, IT, LI, NL, SE [2000/04] |
Former [1999/05] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Elektrisches PTC Heizelement | [1999/05] | English: | Electrical PTC heating device | [1999/05] | French: | Elément de chaufage électrique | [1999/05] | Examination procedure | 09.11.1999 | Examination requested [2000/01] | 20.11.1999 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 25.04.2000 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, FI, GR, LU, MC, PT | 04.05.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.11.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.03.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 05.09.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.12.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/27] | 23.01.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2003/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 02.02.2000 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 02.02.2000 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 02.02.2000 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 02.02.2000 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 02.02.2000 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 02.02.2000 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 02.02.2000 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2002 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0379873 (EICHENAUER GMBH & CO KG F [DE]) [A] 1 * abstract ** column 5, line 37 - column 8, line 11 *; | [DA]US4954692 (SHIKAMA TAKASHI [JP], et al) [DA] 1 * column 3, line 60 - column 4, line 46 * * column 5, line 19 - column 6, line 23 * * column 6, line 19 - line 45 * |