EP0847133 - A capacitively powered motor and constant speed control therefor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 28.02.2003 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.02.2003 | Refusal of application | published on 16.04.2003 [2003/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1998/24] | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hollenbeck, Robert Keith 12212 Amber Ridge Drive Fort Wayne, Indiana 46804 / US | 02 /
Kiefer, James Ronald 5440 Archwood Lane Fort Wayne, Indiana 46825 / US | 03 /
Erdman, David Marvin 5120 Archwood Lane Fort Wayne, Indiana 46825 / US | [1998/24] | Representative(s) | Goode, Ian Roy, et al London Patent Operation General Electric International, Inc. 15 John Adam Street London WC2N 6LU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1998/24] | Goode, Ian Roy, et al London Patent Operation General Electric International, Inc., Essex House, 12-13 Essex Street London WC2R 3AA / GB | Application number, filing date | 97309812.2 | 04.12.1997 | [1998/24] | Priority number, date | US19960761748 | 05.12.1996 Original published format: US 761748 | [1998/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0847133 | Date: | 10.06.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.03.1998 | Classification | IPC: | H02P6/08 | [1998/24] | CPC: |
H02P6/08 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, SE [1999/08] |
Former [1998/24] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Kapazitiv angetriebener Motor und zugehörige konstante Geschwindigkeitsregelung | [1998/24] | English: | A capacitively powered motor and constant speed control therefor | [1998/24] | French: | Moteur entraîné capacitivement et contrôle de vitesse constante à cet effet | [1998/24] | Examination procedure | 02.07.1998 | Observations by third parties | 10.12.1998 | Examination requested [1999/05] | 05.10.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.04.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.05.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 13.11.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [2003/16] | 23.11.2002 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2003/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.01.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2002 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH06245581 ; | [A]US4347464 (PARK JOHN N ET AL) [A] 1,6 * abstract *; | [A]JPH01248988 ; | [A]EP0613234 (GEN ELECTRIC) [A] 1,2,6 * abstract *; | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19941206), vol. 018, no. 641, Database accession no. (E - 1639), & JP06245581 A 19940902 (FUJI XEROX CO LTD) [X] 1,3,4 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19890108), vol. 014, no. 002, Database accession no. (E - 868), & JP01248988 A 19891004 (SECOH GIKEN INC) [A] 1,2,6 * abstract * | [A] - MAYER J S ET AL, "ANALYSIS AND MODELING OF A SINGLE-PHASE BRUSHLESS DC MOTOR DRIVE SYSTEM", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON ENERGY CONVERSION, (198909), vol. 4, no. 3, pages 473 - 479, XP000039111 [A] 1 * figure 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/60.43251 |