EP0847964 - An oxide fluorescent glass capable of exhibiting visible fluorescence [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.05.2002 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.05.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 19.06.2002 [2002/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SUMITA OPTICAL GLASS, INC. 4-7-25, Harigaya Urawa-shi Saitama-ken / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1998/25] | For all designated states SUMITA OPTICAL GLASS, INC. 4-7-25, Harigaya Urawa-shi, Saitama-ken / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yamazaki, Masaaki c/o Sumita Optical Glass Inc., 4-7-25 Harigaya Urawa-shi, Saitama-ken / JP | 02 /
Otsuka, Masaaki c/o Sumita Optical Glass Inc., 4-7-25 Harigaya Urawa-shi, Saitama-ken / JP | 03 /
Takaku, Hideaki c/o Sumita Optical Glass Inc., 4-7-25 Harigaya Urawa-shi, Saitama-ken / JP | 04 /
Sawanobori, Naruhito c/o Sumita Optical Glass Inc., 4-7-25 Harigaya Urawa-shi, Saitama-ken / JP | [1998/25] | Representative(s) | Baverstock, Michael George Douglas, et al BOULT WADE TENNANT, Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1998/25] | Baverstock, Michael George Douglas, et al BOULT WADE TENNANT, 27 Furnival Street London EC4A 1PQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 97309979.9 | 11.12.1997 | [1998/25] | Priority number, date | JP19960332172 | 12.12.1996 Original published format: JP 33217296 | [1998/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0847964 | Date: | 17.06.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0847964 | Date: | 27.06.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.03.1998 | Classification | IPC: | C03C3/068, C03C3/095, C03C4/12 | [1998/25] | CPC: |
C03C3/068 (EP,US);
C03C4/12 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, GB [1999/09] |
Former [1998/25] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Fluoreszierendes Oxidglas mit sichtbarer Fluoreszenz | [1998/25] | English: | An oxide fluorescent glass capable of exhibiting visible fluorescence | [1998/25] | French: | Verre oxidé fluorescent montrant une fluorescence visible | [1998/25] | Examination procedure | 16.07.1998 | Examination requested [1998/38] | 07.09.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.12.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.09.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 11.12.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 21.12.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.03.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 13.03.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.03.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS49116111 ; | [A]JPS57205339 ; | [DA]JPS4999609 ; | [DA]JPS4999610 ; | [A]GB1136239 (SYLVANIA ELECTRIC PROD) [A] 1-3 * the whole document *; | [X]EP0266812 (PHILIPS NV [NL]) [X] 1 * example -; claim - *; | [X]EP0338934 (CENTRE NAT RECH SCIENT [FR]) [X] 1-3 * figure 1; claim - *; | [X]US5039631 (KRASHKEVICH DAVID [US], et al) [X] 1-3 * column 2, line 19 - line 47 * * claim -; table - *; | [X]US5108959 (BUCHANAN ROBERT A [US], et al) [X] 1-3 * column 1, line 54 - line 29 * * column 3, line 11 - line 64 * * claim -; table 1 *; | [A]EP0709345 (SUMITA OPTICAL GLASS [JP]) [A] 1-3 * the whole document *; | [D]JPH08133780 (SUMITA OPTICAL GLASS); | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 75, no. 35, Database accession no. 75-57668W, XP002058455 & JPS49116111 A 19741106 (SUWA SEIKOSHA KK) [A] 1-3 * abstract * | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 83, no. 05, Database accession no. 83-10494K, XP002058456 & JPS57205339 A 19821216 (HITACHI LTD) [A] 1-3 * abstract * | [DA] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 75, no. 14, Database accession no. 75-23099W, XP002058457 & JPS4999609 A 19740920 (SANTOKU METAL INDUSTRY) [DA] 1-3 * abstract * | [DA] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 75, no. 15, Database accession no. 75-24919W, XP002058458 & JPS4999610 A 19740920 (SANTOKU METAL IND CO LTD) [DA] 1-3 * abstract * |