EP0851640 - Correction of DC and phase offsets in PSK receivers [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.06.2006 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.06.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.07.2006 [2006/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nokia Corporation Keilalahdentie 4 02150 Espoo / FI | [2002/11] |
Former [1998/27] | For all designated states NOKIA MOBILE PHONES LTD. Keilalahdentie 4 02150 Espoo / FI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lobo, Natividade Albert 5 Ellison Close Windsor, Berkshire, SL4 4BZ / GB | 02 /
Yim, Terence Wan Hung 1 Hollow Close Lyn Wood, Guildford, Surrey, GU2 5JJ / GB | [1998/27] | Representative(s) | Higgin, Paul, et al Swindell & Pearson Limited 48 Friar Gate Derby DE1 1GY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2005/21] | Higgin, Paul, et al Swindell & Pearson 48 Friar Gate Derby DE1 1GY / GB | ||
Former [1998/27] | Haws, Helen Louise, et al Nokia Mobile Phones, St. George's Court, St. George's Road Camberley, Surrey GU15 3QZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 97310162.9 | 16.12.1997 | [1998/27] | Priority number, date | GB19960027082 | 31.12.1996 Original published format: GB 9627082 | [1998/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0851640 | Date: | 01.07.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/27] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0851640 | Date: | 21.03.2001 | [2001/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0851640 | Date: | 17.08.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.02.2001 | Classification | IPC: | H04L27/233, H04L25/06 | [1998/27] | CPC: |
H04L25/061 (EP,US);
H04L27/2332 (EP,US);
H04L2027/003 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, SE [2001/50] |
Former [1998/27] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Korrektur von Gleichstrom- und Phasenverschiebungen in PSK-Empfängern | [1998/27] | English: | Correction of DC and phase offsets in PSK receivers | [1998/27] | French: | Correction de décalages du composant continu et de phase, dans des récepteurs de signaux MDP | [1998/27] | Examination procedure | 21.09.2001 | Examination requested [2001/46] | 27.05.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.09.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.11.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.03.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 21.03.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.04.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | Opposition(s) | 18.05.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/30] | Request for further processing for: | 14.06.2005 | Request for further processing filed | 14.06.2005 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 29.06.2005 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5495510 (KIMIAVI MANI [FR]) [A] 1,3-10,12 * column 1, line 17 - line 19 * * column 4, line 66 - column 5, line 7 * * column 10, line 9 - line 50 *; | [A]US4180779 (HILBERG RONALD P [US], et al) [A] 1,3-10,12 * abstract * * column 4, line 53 - column 5, line 5 * * column 5, line 33 - line 47 *; | [A] - CRITCHLOW D L, "DC RESTORATION TECHNIQUE FOR DUOBINARY TRANSMISSION THROUGH BAND-PASS CHANNEL", IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN,US,IBM CORP. NEW YORK, (196908), vol. 12, no. 3, ISSN 0018-8689, page 439, XP000759938 [A] 1,2,11 * the whole document * |