EP0849333 - Rubber composition for a tyre tread [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 24.09.2004 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.06.2008 | Change - representative | published on 16.07.2008 [2008/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SUMITOMO RUBBER INDUSTRIES LIMITED 6-9, 3-chome, Wakinohama-cho, Chuo-ku Kobe-shi Hyogo-ken / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1998/26] | For all designated states SUMITOMO RUBBER INDUSTRIES LIMITED 6-9, 3-chome, Wakinohama-cho, Chuo-ku Kobe-shi, Hyogo-ken / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Matsuo, Toshiro 528-4, Futamata, Hiraoka-cho Kakogawa-shi, Hyogo-ken / JP | 02 /
Saba, Hayato c/o Sumitomo Chem. Co., Ltd., 5-1, Anesakikaigan Ichihara-shi, Chiba-ken / JP | [1998/26] | Representative(s) | Manitz Finsterwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Postfach 31 02 20 80102 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/29] | Manitz, Finsterwald & Partner GbR Postfach 31 02 20 80102 München / DE | ||
Former [2002/31] | Manitz, Finsterwald & Partner Postfach 31 02 20 80102 München / DE | ||
Former [1998/26] | Stewart, Charles Geoffrey Dunlop Tyres Ltd Fort Dunlop, Erdington, Birmingham B24 9QT / GB | Application number, filing date | 97310253.6 | 16.12.1997 | [1998/26] | Priority number, date | JP19960336787 | 17.12.1996 Original published format: JP 33678796 | [1998/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0849333 | Date: | 24.06.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0849333 | Date: | 18.04.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/16] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP0849333 | Date: | 10.11.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.03.1998 | Classification | IPC: | C08L83/10, C08K3/36, C08K3/04, C08G77/442, C08C19/44 | [1998/26] | CPC: |
C08L15/00 (EP,US);
C08C19/44 (EP,US);
C08G77/442 (EP,US);
C08K3/04 (EP,US);
C08K3/36 (EP,US);
Y02T10/86 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C08K3/04, C08L83/10 (EP,US);
C08K3/36, C08L83/10 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1999/10] |
Former [1998/26] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Kautschukmischung für Reifenlauffläche | [1998/26] | English: | Rubber composition for a tyre tread | [1998/26] | French: | Composition de caoutchouc pour bande de roulement | [1998/26] | Examination procedure | 21.09.1998 | Examination requested [1998/47] | 18.06.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.08.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.08.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 12.10.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.12.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 15.12.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
17.01.2002
ADMISSIBLE Stemplinger Lindenstrasse 12 D-94051 Hauzenberg / DE Opponent's representative Adam, Holger, et al, et al Kraus & Weisert Patentanwälte PartGmbB Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/11] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
17.01.2002
ADMISSIBLE Stemplinger Lindenstrasse 12 D-94051 Hauzenberg / DE Opponent's representative Adam, Holger, Dr., et al, et al Kraus & Weisert, Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | 06.03.2002 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 22.07.2002 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 12.11.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04) | 10.03.2003 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 26.03.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M02) | 25.04.2003 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 19.11.2003 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 01.12.2003 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 10.03.2004 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 17.06.2004 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0661298 (BRIDGESTONE CORP [JP]) [A] 1-6 * page 17, line 12 - line 16; examples 1-4; claims 1,16 *; | [A]EP0520279 (BRIDGESTONE CORP [JP]) [A] 1 * examples 1,2; claims 1,3 *; | [T]JPH09110904 | [T] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19970829), vol. 097, no. 008, & JP09110904 A 19970428 (SUMITOMO CHEM CO LTD) [T] 1 * abstract * | Opposition | US3244664 | US5409969 |