EP0849157 - Bicycle shifting control apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 14.11.2008 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.11.2008 | Patent maintained (B2 publication) | published on 17.12.2008 [2008/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SHIMANO INC. 3-77, Oimatsu-cho Sakai-ku Sakai City Osaka 590-8577 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2006/31] | For all designated states SHIMANO INC. 3-77 Oimatsu-cho, Sakai-ku, Sakai City Osaka 590-8577 / JP | ||
Former [2004/31] | For all designated states Shimano Inc. 77, Oimatsu-cho 3-cho, Sakai Osaka 590-0824 / JP | ||
Former [1998/26] | For all designated states SHIMANO INC. 77, Oimatsu-cho 3-cho, Sakai Osaka 590 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ose, Kenji 2131-1-204 Hishiki 2-cyo Sakai-shi, Osaka / JP | 02 /
Takahashi, Noriaki 2090-4-419 Fukaishimizucyo Sakai-shi, Osaka / JP | [1998/26] | Representative(s) | Murnane, Graham John, et al Murgitroyd & Company Scotland House 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/24] | Murnane, Graham John, et al Murgitroyd & Company 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | ||
Former [1998/26] | Pacitti, Pierpaolo A.M.E., et al Murgitroyd and Company 373 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8QA / GB | Application number, filing date | 97310352.6 | 19.12.1997 | [1998/26] | Priority number, date | JP19960340016 | 19.12.1996 Original published format: JP 34001696 | [1998/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0849157 | Date: | 24.06.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/26] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0849157 | Date: | 05.08.1998 | [1998/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0849157 | Date: | 28.07.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/31] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP0849157 | Date: | 17.12.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.06.1998 | Classification | IPC: | B62M25/04, B62K23/06 | [1998/26] | CPC: |
B62K23/06 (EP);
B62M25/04 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, IT [1999/16] |
Former [1998/26] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Steuerungseinrichtung für eine Fahrradgangschaltung | [1998/26] | English: | Bicycle shifting control apparatus | [1998/26] | French: | Dispositif de commande de changement de vitesse pour bicyclette | [1998/26] | Examination procedure | 15.01.1998 | Examination requested [1998/26] | 06.02.1999 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 20.05.1999 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, DK, ES, FI, GB, GR, IE, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | 26.06.1999 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.06.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.10.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.09.2003 | Date of oral proceedings | 08.10.2003 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 12.02.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.04.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 01.04.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
22.04.2005
29.04.2005
ADMISSIBLE SRAM Deutschland GmbH Romstr. 1 97424 Schweinfurt / DE Opponent's representative Thum, Bernhard Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte und Rechtsanwalt PartG mbB Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/47] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
22.04.2005
29.04.2005
ADMISSIBLE SRAM Deutschland GmbH Romstr. 1 97424 Schweinfurt / DE Opponent's representative Thum, Bernhard Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | ||
Former [2005/25] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
22.04.2005
29.04.2005
ADMISSIBLE SRAM Deutschland GmbH Romstr. 1 97424 Schweinfurt / DE | 03.06.2005 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 12.11.2005 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 09.04.2008 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 09.04.2008 | Date of oral proceedings | 30.04.2008 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 30.04.2008 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 02.09.2008 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 05.11.2008 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 08.03.1999 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 08.03.1999 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 08.03.1999 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 08.03.1999 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 08.03.1999 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 08.03.1999 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 08.03.1999 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 08.03.1999 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 08.03.1999 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 08.03.1999 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 08.03.1999 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 08.03.1999 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 08.03.1999 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 08.03.1999 | SE   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]EP0719701 (SHIMANO KK [JP]) [X] 1-16,34,47-49 * the whole document * [A] 17,36,39,50; | [A]US4245522 (ROBINSON MERRITT A) [A] 1 * column W * | Examination | US5361645 | Opposition | US3901095 | EP0849150 |