EP0851122 - Hydraulic pump control system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.04.2005 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.02.2006 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GB | published on 29.03.2006 [2006/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Shin Caterpillar Mitsubishi Ltd. 10-1, Yoga 4-chome, Setagaya-ku Tokyo 158 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1998/27] | For all designated states Shin Caterpillar Mitsubishi Ltd. 10-1, Yoga 4-chome, Setagaya-ku Tokyo 158 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Konishi, Hideo, c/o Shin Caterpillar Mitsub. Ltd. 10-1 Yoga 4-chome Setagaya-ku, Tokyo 158 / JP | 02 /
Samejima, Makoto, c/o Mitsubishi Heavy Ind., Ltd. 5-1 Marunouchi, 2-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo / JP | [1998/27] | Representative(s) | Smith, Norman Ian, et al Cleveland 40-43 Chancery Lane London WC2A 1JQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1998/27] | Smith, Norman Ian, et al fJ CLEVELAND 40-43 Chancery Lane London WC2A 1JQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 97310426.8 | 22.12.1997 | [1998/27] | Priority number, date | JP19960357840 | 27.12.1996 Original published format: JP 35784096 | [1998/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0851122 | Date: | 01.07.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/27] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0851122 | Date: | 22.09.1999 | [1999/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0851122 | Date: | 26.05.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.08.1999 | Classification | IPC: | F04B49/06 | [1998/27] | CPC: |
F04B49/065 (EP,KR,US);
F04B49/002 (KR);
E02F9/2235 (EP,US);
F02D31/001 (EP,US);
F04B17/05 (KR);
F04B49/08 (EP,US);
F02D2250/24 (EP,US);
F04B2201/1202 (EP,US);
F04B2205/05 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT [2000/22] |
Former [1998/27] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Steuersystem einer hydraulischen Pumpe | [1998/27] | English: | Hydraulic pump control system | [1998/27] | French: | Système de commande pour pompe hydraulique | [1998/27] | Examination procedure | 06.10.1999 | Examination requested [1999/48] | 12.06.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.11.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.12.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.02.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 16.02.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.03.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 06.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GB | 22.12.2004 | BE | 31.12.2004 | [2006/13] |
Former [2005/51] | BE | 31.12.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US5267441 (DEVIER LONNIE J [US], et al) [X] 1-3 * figures 1-4; claims 1-4 * [Y] 4-7; | [Y]DE4431341 (SACHSENHYDRAULIK GMBH [DE]) [Y] 4-7 * column 2, line 17 - column 5, line 6; figure 1 *; | [A]EP0326150 (HITACHI CONSTRUCTION MACHINERY [JP]) [A] 1 * column 1, line 47 - column 2, line 19; figures 12-14 * * column 24, line 58 - column 26, line 2 *; | [A]DE4307827 (BARMAG BARMER MASCHF [DE]) [A] 1 * column 1, line 34 - column 3, line 64; figure 5 *; | [PA]EP0795651 (KOBE STEEL LTD [JP]) [PA] 4-7 * claim 2 * |